EP1101801 - Bismuth-based pigments and process for their manufacure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cappelle Pigments N.V. Kortrijkstraat 153 8930 Menen / BE | [2004/14] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Gebroeders Cappelle Naamloze Vennootschap Kortrijkstraat 115 8930 Menen / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vermoortele, Frank 126, avenue de la Marne 59700 Marq en Baroeul / FR | 02 /
Buyse, Emile Joseph rue de la Barberie, 50 7700 Mouscron / BE | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Michel, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 99870240.1 | 22.11.1999 | [2001/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1101801 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1101801 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, C01G29/00 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
C09C1/0006 (EP,US);
C01G29/006 (EP,US);
C01P2004/84 (EP,US);
C01P2006/60 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2993 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31696 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3171 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31717 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/21] | Title | German: | Auf Bismut basierende Pigmente und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2001/21] | English: | Bismuth-based pigments and process for their manufacure | [2001/21] | French: | Pigments à base de bismuth et procédé pour leur fabrication | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 14.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.2004 | CY | 10.03.2004 | FI | 10.03.2004 | IE | 10.03.2004 | DK | 10.06.2004 | GR | 10.06.2004 | SE | 10.06.2004 | PT | 10.08.2004 | LU | 22.11.2004 | BE | 30.11.2004 | CH | 30.11.2004 | LI | 30.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/21] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
CY | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
LU | 22.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
SE | 10.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4230500 (BALDUCCI LUIGI, et al) [A] 1-3,5-13 * column W *; | [AD]US5958126 (ADEL JOERG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-3,5-13* column W * |