EP0931765 - Method and device for treating water containing genotoxic substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ÖSTERREICHISCHES FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM SEIBERSDORF GES.M.B.H. 2444 Seibersdorf / AT | [1999/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehringer, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., Dr. Radetzkystrasse 18/6 1030 Wien / AT | 02 /
Eschweiler, Helmut Irumauerstrasse 9/4/1 2440 Moosbrunn / AT | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Wildhack, Helmut Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 1030 Wien / AT | [2009/31] |
Former [1999/30] | Wildhack, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Gerhard Jellinek, Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 99890012.0 | 21.01.1999 | [1999/30] | Priority number, date | AT19980000102 | 21.01.1998 Original published format: AT 10298 | [1999/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0931765 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0931765 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/30, C02F1/78, C02F1/28, C02F9/00 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
C02F1/78 (EP);
C02F1/30 (EP);
C02F1/283 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/30] | C02F1/30, C02F1/78 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/29] |
Former [1999/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Aufbereitung von mit gentoxischen Substanzen belastetem Wasser | [1999/30] | English: | Method and device for treating water containing genotoxic substances | [1999/30] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour le traitement des eaux contenant des substances génotoxiques | [1999/30] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 20.05.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 09.04.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 30.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/19] | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.06.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]AT405173B (OESTERR FORSCH SEIBERSDORF) [E] 1,4,6-13,15,16 * page 6, line 37 - page 7, line 30; figure 1 *; | AT110496B [ ] (OESTERR FORSCH SEIBERSDORF); | [X]WO9101946 (OESTERR FORSCH SEIBERSDORF) [X] 11-13 * page 12, line 7 - page 13, line 32; figure . *; | [A]DE4209056 (POLYMER PHYSIK GMBH) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5457269 (SCHONBERG) [A] * the whole document *; | [A] - GEHRINGER ET AL, "Ozone/Electron Beam Process for Water Treatment: Design, Limitations and Economic Considerations", ÖSTERREICHISCHES FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM SEIBERSDORF, BERICHTE, (199601), vol. OEFZS--4767, XP002114775 [A] * page 9, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5; table 1 * |