EP0955484 - Torsional vibration damper, torsionally elastic coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ellergon Antriebstechnik GmbH Hallwanger Landesstrasse 3 5300 Hallwang/Salzburg / AT | [1999/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martinek, Felix, Dipl.-Ing. Eichenweg 35 5302 Henndorf / AT | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 99890100.3 | 24.03.1999 | [1999/45] | Priority number, date | AT19980000776 | 08.05.1998 Original published format: AT 77698 | [1999/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0955484 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0955484 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | [2002/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0955484 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/121, F16F15/133, F16D3/56 | [2002/07] | CPC: |
F16F15/1331 (EP,US);
F16F15/10 (KR);
F16D3/56 (EP,US);
F16F15/1211 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/45] | F16F15/121, F16F15/133 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/44] |
Former [1999/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Drehschwingungsdämpfer bzw. drehelastische Kupplung | [1999/45] | English: | Torsional vibration damper, torsionally elastic coupling | [1999/45] | French: | Amortisseur de vibrations torsionelles, accouplement torsionel élastique | [1999/45] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 14.08.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.12.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 27.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.09.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.09.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3996767 (GEISLINGER LEONHARD) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2,3; | [A]US4104891 (GEISLINGER LEONHARD); | [A]GB2111169 (GEISLINGER CO SCHWINGUNGSTECHN); | [Y]US5364308 (VOLLET ERIC M [GB]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * |