blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974188

EP0974188 - FLYBACK CONVERTER WITH LIMITED OUTPUT POWER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DER WAL, Robbert, H.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / ETTES, Wilhelmus, G., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria, et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria, et al
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99900238.921.01.1999
[2000/04]
WO1999IB00093
Priority number, dateEP1998020027530.01.1998         Original published format: EP 98200275
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9939427
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974188
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE05.08.1999
ClassificationIPC:H02M3/335
[2000/04]
CPC:
H02M3/33523 (EP,US); H02M3/07 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:SPERRWANDLER MIT BEGRENZTEM AUSGANGSSTROM[2000/04]
English:FLYBACK CONVERTER WITH LIMITED OUTPUT POWER[2000/04]
French:CONVERTISSEUR INDIRECT A PUISSANCE DE SORTIE LIMITEE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase02.11.1999National basic fee paid 
02.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
23.06.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0653831  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]);
 [A]US4623960  (ENG WING K [US]);
 [A]WO9712436  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al);
 [A]US5661642  (SHIMASHITA ISHIO [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.