blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974160

EP0974160 - PROCESS OF MANUFACTURING A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE INCLUDING A BURIED CHANNEL FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.08.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.09.2006  [2006/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / FRIJLINK, Peter
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / OSZUSTOWICZ, Jean-Luc
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/04]
Representative(s)van Oudheusden-Perset, Laure E., et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 44
5656 AE Eindhoven / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/17]van Oudheusden-Perset, Laure E., et al
Société Civile SPID 156, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2005/09]Charpail, François, et al
Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/04]Lottin, Claudine
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, 156 Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99900239.721.01.1999
[2000/04]
WO1999IB00094
Priority number, dateEP1998040028909.02.1998         Original published format: EP 98400289
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9940618
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974160
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE12.08.1999
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/336, H01L29/78
[2000/04]
CPC:
H10D30/015 (EP,US); H01L21/28587 (EP,US); H10D30/4732 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT MIT EINEM BEGRABENEN KANAL RELDEFFEKTTRANSISTOR[2000/04]
English:PROCESS OF MANUFACTURING A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE INCLUDING A BURIED CHANNEL FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTOR[2000/04]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR COMPRENANT UN TRANSISTOR A EFFET DE CHAMP A CANAL ENTERRE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase09.11.1999National basic fee paid 
09.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
13.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/37]
28.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JP10189618  ;
 [A]US4984036  (SAKAMOTO SHINICHI [JP], et al);
 [X]US5270228  (ISHIKAWA TAKAHIDE [JP]);
 [X]US5364816  (BOOS J BRAD [US], et al);
 [X]US5534452  (NAKANISHI MAMIKO [JP], et al);
 [A]US5539228  (CHI TOM Y [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.