EP1087445 - INERTIA FORCE SENSOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING INERTIA FORCE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHJI, Hiroshi Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
TSUTSUMI, Kaz. Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
FRENCH, Patrick, J. Koetlaan 40 NL-2625 KS Delft / NL | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99900292.6 | 13.01.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999JP00078 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0042666 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1087445 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.07.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/08, G01P15/125, B81C1/00, B81B3/00 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
G01P15/125 (EP,KR,US);
G01P15/0802 (EP,KR,US);
B81C1/00182 (EP,KR,US);
G01L9/0042 (EP,KR,US);
G01P15/123 (EP,KR,US);
B81B2201/025 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0118 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0315 (EP,US);
B81C2201/0114 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/13] | H01L29/84, G01L9/04, G01P15/12, G01P15/125 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR [2001/13] | Title | German: | TRÄGHEITSKRAFTSENSOR UND VERFAHREN SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2001/13] | English: | INERTIA FORCE SENSOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING INERTIA FORCE SENSOR | [2001/13] | French: | CAPTEUR DE FORCE D'INERTIE ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN TEL CAPTEUR DE FORCE D'INERTIE | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2000 | Translation filed | 13.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 02.04.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5719073 (SHAW KEVIN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 8, lines 59-63 * * column 11, lines 35-49; figures 1i,j,2 * [A] 7; | [XA]WO9509367 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 7, line 31 * * page 9, lines 17-34; figures 1-2b * [A] 7; | [E]WO9949506 (SURFACE TECH SYS LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1,2 * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 1 *; | [A]EP0553465 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 7 * page 3, lines 24-49, paragraph 1 * | International search | [X]JPH0715019 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [X]JPH08236785 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD); | [X]JPH08236789 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD); | [Y]JPH04323566 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) |