Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002503060 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9802547 | 05.02.1998 | GB9900057 | 08.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1977399 | Global Dossier | 23.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9802547 | 05.02.1998 | GB9900057 | 08.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1051832 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | B1 | EP1051832 | 15.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9802547 | 05.02.1998 | GB9900057 | 08.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2318230 | 12.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9802547 | 05.02.1998 | GB9900057 | 08.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6654457 | 25.11.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | GB9802547 | 05.02.1998 | GB9900057 | 08.01.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9940712 | Global Dossier | 12.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9802547 | 05.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4778029B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2011 | B2 | JP2009044748 | 26.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9802547 | 05.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1299490C | 07.02.2007 | C | CN1290446 | 04.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9802547 | 05.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9802547D0 | 01.04.1998 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9802547 | 05.02.1998 |