EP1051832 - CALL CENTRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2011/25] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEDDUS, Simon, Alexander 35 Grove Lane Ipswich, Suffolk IP4 1NX / GB | 02 /
WILLS, Fenela 10 Heathfields, Trimley St. Martin Felixstowe, Suffolk IP11 0GA / GB | 03 /
FISHER, David, Mark 39 Clarkson Street Ipswich, Suffolk IP1 2JL / GB | 04 /
WELLS, David 4 Mount Pleasant Norwich NR2 2DG / GB | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Simeon Paul, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Williamson, Simeon, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department, PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London, EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/15] | Robinson, Simon Benjamin, et al BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department 8th Floor, Holborn Centre 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | ||
Former [2000/46] | Wells, David BT Group Legal Services Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99900557.2 | 08.01.1999 | [2000/46] | WO1999GB00057 | Priority number, date | GB19980002547 | 05.02.1998 Original published format: GB 9802547 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940712 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051832 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1051832 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/50, H04M7/00, H04L29/06 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
H04M7/003 (EP,US);
H04M3/5191 (EP,US);
H04M3/523 (EP,US);
H04M3/4285 (EP,US);
H04M3/48 (EP,US);
H04M3/5175 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [2000/46] | Title | German: | ANRUFZENTRALE | [2000/46] | English: | CALL CENTRE | [2000/46] | French: | CENTRE D'APPELS | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 29.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.06.2011 | IT | 22.06.2011 | NL | 22.06.2011 | ES | 03.10.2011 | IE | 08.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | [2013/22] |
Former [2013/08] | BE | 22.06.2011 | |
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 22.06.2011 | |
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 22.06.2011 | |
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | BE | 22.06.2011 | |
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | NL | 22.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0740445 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,6-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO9728635 (GENESYS TELECOMM LAB INC [US]); | [XD]WO9750235 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [XD] 1,3,6-11 * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 2 *; | [PX]WO9820667 (TELOQUENT COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]) [PX] 1-11* page 1, line 14 - page 4, line 13 *; | [X] - LAUTENBACHER M E ET AL, "INTELLIGENT INTERNET: VALUE-ADDED SERVICES BY INTERWORKING BETWEEN NETWORK TECHNOLOGIES", ISS '97. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHIN SYMPOSIUM), GLOBAL NETWORK EVOLUTION: CONVERGENCE OR COLLISION? TORONTO, SEPT. 21 - 26, 1997, ABDALLAH ABI-AAD ET AL, (19970921), VOL. 2, pages 45 - 51, XP000704454 [X] 1,3,6-11 * paragraph [03.1] * |