blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980217

EP0980217 - HAIR DRYING AND STYLING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / EHLHARDT, Huub
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Bos, Kornelis Sjoerd, et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Bos, Kornelis Sjoerd, et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99900585.325.01.1999
[2000/08]
WO1999IB00114
Priority number, dateEP1998020033905.02.1998         Original published format: EP 98200339
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9939609
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980217
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980217
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE12.08.1999
ClassificationIPC:A45D20/12, A45D20/50
[2000/08]
CPC:
A45D20/12 (EP,KR,US); A45D20/10 (KR); A45D20/38 (KR);
A45D20/50 (KR)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/08]
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUM TROCKNEN UND FORMEN VON HAAREN[2000/08]
English:HAIR DRYING AND STYLING APPLIANCE[2000/08]
French:APPAREIL DE SECHAGE ET DE COIFFURE DES CHEVEUX[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase05.11.1999National basic fee paid 
05.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
02.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2003Fee for grant paid
26.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT03.09.2003
[2008/17]
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0813827  (WIK ELEKTRO HAUSGERAETE [DE]);
 [Y]FR685785  ;
 [A]GB2294200  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]);
 [A]US1328120  (BRICKER GRACE L);
 [A]DE4445237  (BRAUN AG [DE]);
 [A]US5671547  (TRUCHET PAUL [FR], et al);
 [AP]US5765575  (DENEBEIM SABRINA R [US]);
 [AP]US5839451  (DORBER RALF [DE], et al);
 [AP]WO9827843  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.