blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972419

EP0972419 - A METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOBILE PHONE DEVICE IN A DYNAMIC ENVIRONMENT WHEREIN A PARTICULAR DYNAMISM MAY MANDATE TO CHANGE A TRANSMITTING MODE, AND A MOBILE PHONE DEVICE FOR USE WITH SUCH METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cellon France SAS
Route d'Angers
72100 Le Mans / FR
[2003/13]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / PELTONEN, Jari
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Kohn, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn
30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Kohn, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
Former [2002/50]Kohn, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn, 30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
Former [2000/03]Deguelle, Wilhelmus Hendrikus Gerardus, et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99900598.628.01.1999
[2000/03]
WO1999IB00153
Priority number, dateEP1998040028809.02.1998         Original published format: EP 98400288
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9940745
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972419
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE30.09.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04Q7/38
[2000/03]
CPC:
H04W36/26 (EP,US); H04W88/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES MOBILTELEFONS IN EINER DYNAMISCHEN UMGEBUNG IN DER EINE BESTIMMTE DYNAMIK EINEN WECHSEL DES ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHRENS VERANLASST SOWIE EIN MOBILTELEFON FÜR DEN GEBRAUCH MIT DIESEM VERFAHREN[2000/03]
English:A METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOBILE PHONE DEVICE IN A DYNAMIC ENVIRONMENT WHEREIN A PARTICULAR DYNAMISM MAY MANDATE TO CHANGE A TRANSMITTING MODE, AND A MOBILE PHONE DEVICE FOR USE WITH SUCH METHOD[2000/03]
French:PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TELEPHONE MOBILE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DYNAMIQUE, DYNAMISME PARTICULIER POUVANT MANDATER UN CHANGEMENT DE MODE DE TRANSMISSION, ET TELEPHONE MOBILE DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE DANS CE PROCEDE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase09.11.1999National basic fee paid 
09.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
03.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/05]
03.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US4654867  (LABEDZ GERALD P [US], et al);
 [X]US5140627  (DAHLIN JAN E A S [SE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.