blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980222

EP0980222 - APPARATUS FOR PREPARING BEVERAGES WITH END OF BREW PHASE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / NICOLAI, Haayo
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99900614.128.01.1999
[2000/08]
WO1999IB00169
Priority number, dateEP1998020039709.02.1998         Original published format: EP 98200397
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9939619
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980222
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980222
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE12.08.1999
ClassificationIPC:A47J31/44
[2000/08]
CPC:
A47J31/545 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/08]
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUM ZUBEREITEN VON GETRÄNKEN MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANGEBEN DES BRÜHENDES[2000/08]
English:APPARATUS FOR PREPARING BEVERAGES WITH END OF BREW PHASE DETECTION[2000/08]
French:PERCOLATEUR A DETECTION DE LA FIN DE PERCOLATION[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase09.11.1999National basic fee paid 
09.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
19.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2002Fee for grant paid
08.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.09.2002
IT18.09.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/17]
Former [2004/05]AT18.09.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/31]AT18.09.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0171619  (BRAUN AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0354670  (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]);
 [A]EP0514681  (BRAUN AG [DE]);
 [A]US5455887  (DAM NICOLAAS M F [NL])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.