EP1047786 - NUCLEIC ACID CORRESPONDING TO MUTATION ASSOCIATED WITH CHOLESTASIS SYNDROMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACADEMISCH ZIEKENHUIS UTRECHT Heidelberglaan 100 3584 CX Utrecht / NL | [2000/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BULL, Laura, N. 2614 47th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | 02 /
FREIMER, Nelson, B. 630 29th Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 03 /
HOUWEN, Roderick, H., J. Bosuillaan 28 NL-3722 XN Bilthoven / NL | 04 /
KNISELY, Alexander, S. 933 Beech Avenue San Francisco, CA 15233 / US | 05 /
PAWLIKOWSKA, Ludmila 1547 11th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | 06 /
VAN EIJK, Michiel, J., T. Tolsteegplantsoen 43 NL-3523 AN Utrecht / NL | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99900717.2 | 18.01.1999 | [2000/44] | WO1999NL00033 | Priority number, date | US19980071752P | 16.01.1998 Original published format: US 71752 P | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9936533 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1047786 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/55, C12N15/12, C12N5/10, A01K67/027, C07K16/00, A61K48/00, C12Q1/68, C12N9/14 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
C12N9/14 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | DER MIT CHOLESTASE SYNDROMEN ASSOZIIERTEN MUTATION ENTSPRECHENDE NUCLEISCHE SÄURE | [2000/44] | English: | NUCLEIC ACID CORRESPONDING TO MUTATION ASSOCIATED WITH CHOLESTASIS SYNDROMES | [2000/44] | French: | ACIDE NUCLEIQUE CORRESPONDANT A UNE MUTATION ASSOCIEE A DES CHOLESTASES | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 01.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/10] | 10.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - BULL, L.N. ET AL., "Localization of the BRIC/PFIC1 gene to a 250 kb interval through haplotype analysis", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, usa, (199710), vol. 61, no. 4, page a269, XP002109436 [A] 1 * Abstract 1569 * | [A] - ARNELL, H. ET AL., "Progressive familial intrahepatic cholestasis (PFIC): evidence for genetic heterogeneity by exclusion of linkage to chromosome 18q21-q22", HUMAN GENETICS, (199709), vol. 100, no. 3-4, pages 378 - 381, XP002109429 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004390050519 | [A] - SINKE, R. J. ET AL., "Benign recurrent intrahepatic cholestais (BRIC): evidence of genetic heterogeneity and delimitatiomn of the BRIC locus to a 7-cM interval between D18S69 and D18S64", HUMAN GENETICS, (199709), vol. 100, no. 3-4, pages 382 - 387, XP002109430 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004390050520 | [A] - STRAUTNIEKS, S.S. ET AL., "Locus heterogeneity in progressive familial intrahepatic cholestasis", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL GENETICS, (199610), vol. 33, no. 10, pages 833 - 836, XP002109431 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - TANG ET AL, "A subfamily of P-Type ATPases with aminophospholipid transporting activity", SCIENCE, (19960607), vol. 272, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1495 - 1497, XP002085282 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.272.5267.1495 | [PX] - BULL, L.N. ET AL., "A gene encoding a P-type ATPase mutated in two forms of hereditary cholestasis", NAT GENET, (199803), vol. 18, no. 3, page 219-24, XP002109432 [PX] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng0398-219 | [T] - TYGSTRUP, N. ET AL., "Recurrent familial intrahepatic cholestasis in the Faeroe Islands. Phenotypic heterogeneity but genetic homogeneity", HEPATOLOGY, (199902), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 506 - 508, XP002109433 [T] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.510290214 | [T] - BULL, L.N. ET AL., "Fine-resolution mapping by haplotype evaluation: the examples of PFIC1 and BRIC", HUMAN GENETICS, (199903), vol. 104, no. 3, pages 241 - 248, XP002109434 [T] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/PL00008714 |