EP1045867 - SOLUTION POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nova Chemicals (International) S.A. 2, chemin des Mazots 1700 Fribourg / CH | [2002/20] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Nova Chemicals (International) S.A. Route de la Glane 107, P.O. Box 76 1752 Villars-sur-Glane 1 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gao, Xiaoliang 6 Varmoor Place N.W. Calgary, Alberta T3A 0A1 / CA | 02 /
Wang, Qinyan Apartment 4, 1831 - 14 Avenue N.E. Calgary, Alberta T2E 1G7 / CA | 03 /
VON HAKEN SPENCE, Rupert, Edward 401 - 11 Street N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2N 1X5 / CA | 04 /
BROWN, Stephen, John 157 Mount Sparrowhawk Place S.E. Calgary, Alberta T2Z 2G7 / CA | 05 /
ZORICAK, Peter Apt No 208, 429-14 Street NW Calgary, Alberta T2N 2A3 / CA | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99900845.1 | 18.01.1999 | [2000/43] | WO1999CA00029 | Priority number, date | CA19982228802 | 04.02.1998 Original published format: CA 2228802 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940130 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045867 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1045867 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/02, C08F2/06, C08F4/643, C07F17/00 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/65908 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F2/06 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/43] | Title | German: | LÖSUNGSPOLYMERISATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR ETHYLEN | [2000/43] | English: | SOLUTION POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENE | [2000/43] | French: | POLYMERISATION EN SOLUTION, D'ETHYLENE | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5625016 (SCHIFFINO RINALDO S [US], et al) [DA] 1-17 * column 6, line 20 - column 8, line 38; example -; claim - *; | [DA]US5350723 (NEITHAMER DAVID R [US], et al) [DA] 1-17 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 6 * * example -; claim - *; | [DA]JPH0680683 ; | [A]EP0574794 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 53; claim - *; | [A]WO9325590 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * claim - * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940627), vol. 018, no. 337, Database accession no. (C - 1217), & JP06080683 A 19940322 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [DA] 13-17 * abstract * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 16, Database accession no. 94-132934, XP002100650 & JPH0680683 A 19940322 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [DA] 13-17 * abstract * |