blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0978301

EP0978301 - CHARACTER DISPLAY CONTROLLING DEVICE, DISPLAY CONTROLLING METHOD, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.04.2009
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.05.2009  [2009/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konami Co., Ltd.
3-2, Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 650-0046 / JP
[2008/24]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Konami Co., Ltd.
3-2, Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome, Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-0046 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OOSEKI, Nobuhito
106, Kyatorusezon Mizue 11-15, Mizue 2-chome
Edogawa-ku Tokyo 132-0011 / JP
02 / YAMANE, Kiyohiko
12-8, Honcho 3-chome Fujisawa-shi
Kanagawa 251-0053 / JP
03 / HONDA, Kenichiro
3B, Kyoei Building 18-2, Taishido 4-chome
Setagaya-ku Tokyo 154-0004 / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Morgan, James Garnet
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Morgan, James Garnet
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date99901190.127.01.1999
[2000/06]
WO1999JP00336
Priority number, dateJP1998001964330.01.1998         Original published format: JP 1964398
[2000/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9938588
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978301
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978301
Date:11.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2005
ClassificationIPC:A63F13/00, G10H1/00
[2008/01]
CPC:
G06T15/00 (EP,US); A63F13/825 (KR); G06F3/14 (KR);
G10H1/00 (EP,US); G10H1/0008 (EP,US); G10L25/03 (KR);
A63F2300/1081 (EP,US); A63F2300/6063 (EP,US); A63F2300/8047 (EP,US);
G10H2210/026 (EP,US); G10H2210/031 (EP,US); G10H2250/595 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2005/37]G06T13/00, G10K15/04, G10H1/00, A63F9/22
Former IPC [2000/06]A63F9/22, G06T13/00, G10K15/04, G10H1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/06]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTROLLE VON ZEICHENANZEIGEN, VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE VON BILDSCHIRMEN UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM[2000/06]
English:CHARACTER DISPLAY CONTROLLING DEVICE, DISPLAY CONTROLLING METHOD, AND RECORDING MEDIUM[2000/06]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE DE PERSONNAGES, PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase27.01.1999Translation filed 
28.09.1999National basic fee paid 
28.09.1999Search fee paid 
28.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
10.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2008Fee for grant paid
07.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0869282  ;
 [Y]EP0768105  (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-25 * abstract * * figures 4,7,11,14; claims 1-4 *;
 [Y]US5256832  (MIYAKE ATSUSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-25 * column 1, line 8 - line 11 *;
 [A]JPS6218843  ;
 [A]US5198203  (KRESGE CHARLES T [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0727767  (TELIA AB [SE]) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * claims 1-7 *;
 [XP]EP0823270  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP], et al) [XP] 1-25 * abstract * * figures 5-8,11; claims 1-17 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08069282 A 19960312 (YAMAHA CORP) [X] 1-4,14,23 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870618), vol. 011, no. 190, Database accession no. (E - 517), & JP62018843 A 19870127 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-25 * abstract *
 [A]  - WOLD E ET AL, "Content-based classification, search, and retrieval of audio", IEEE MULTIMEDIA, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, US, (1996), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 1070-986X, pages 27 - 36, XP002154735 [A] 1-25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/93.556537
 [A]  - LIBANO MONTEIRO C ET AL, "Real-time sound analyzer", INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1997. IMTC/97. PROCEEDINGS. SENSING, PROCESSING, NETWORKING., IEEE OTTAWA, ONT., CANADA 19-21 MAY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970519), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-3747-6, pages 414 - 417, XP010233670 [A] 1-25 * the whole document *
International search[X]JPH0869282  (YAMAHA CORP);
 [X]JPS6443398U  ;
 [A]JPH08293039  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JPH09297594  (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK);
 [A]JPH06250683  (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK);
 [A]JPH09160574  (XING INC, et al);
 [A]JPH0493872U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.