blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972748

EP0972748 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING PSEUDO-BOEHMITE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Energy Corporation
10-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
JAPAN ENERGY CORPORATION
10-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TSUKADA, Takayuki, Japan Energy Corporation
17-35, Niizominami 3-chome
Toda-shi, Saitama 335-8502 / JP
02 / OHASHI, Yuji, Japan Energy Corporation
17-35, Niizominami 3-chome
Toda-shi, Saitama 335-8502 / JP
03 / SEGAWA, Hideo, Japan Energy Corporation
17-35, Niizominami 3-chome
Toda-shi, Saitama 335-8502 / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Koepe & Partner
Patentanwälte Robert-Koch-Strasse 1
80538 München / DE
[2004/22]
Former [2000/03]Koepe, Gerd L., Dipl.-Chem.
Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date99901199.229.01.1999
[2000/03]
WO1999JP00391
Priority number, dateJP1998003236330.01.1998         Original published format: JP 3236398
JP1998021213328.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21213398
JP1998024021226.08.1998         Original published format: JP 24021298
[2000/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9938802
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972748
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2000
ClassificationIPC:C01F7/42, C01F7/02, C04B35/10
[2000/24]
CPC:
C01F7/141 (EP,US); C01F7/42 (KR); B01J21/04 (EP,US);
C01F7/34 (EP,US); C01F7/428 (EP,US); C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US); C01P2006/14 (EP,US); C01P2006/16 (EP,US);
C01P2006/21 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2000/03]C01F7/42
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PSEUDOBOEHMIT[2000/03]
English:METHOD OF MANUFACTURING PSEUDO-BOEHMITE[2000/03]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PSEUDO-BOHEMITE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase29.10.1999Translation filed 
29.10.1999National basic fee paid 
29.10.1999Search fee paid 
29.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
02.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/10]
03.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPS52798  (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK, et al);
 [Y]JPS58145618  (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND);
 [X]JPS5978925  (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.