Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9947335 | Global Dossier | 23.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4081698 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9947246 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2000 | A9 | WO9947246 | 23.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4097998 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9944729 | Global Dossier | 10.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3538898 | 05.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0053294 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12345999 | 09.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002537988 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US12345999 | 09.03.1999 | US0006181 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3934876B | Global Dossier | 20.06.2007 | B2 | JP2002509013 | 26.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US4081698 | 18.03.1998 | US9900930 | 15.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3934875B | Global Dossier | 20.06.2007 | B2 | JP2002506717 | 05.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US4097998 | 18.03.1998 | US9905626 | 17.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002505181 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US3538898 | 05.03.1998 | US9904851 | 02.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002502696 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US2229598 | 11.02.1998 | US9900638 | 12.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1159059 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2004 | B1 | EP1159059 | 05.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12345999 | 09.03.1999 | US0006181 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1066106 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2016 | B1 | EP1066106 | 10.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4097998 | 18.03.1998 | US9905626 | 17.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1064139 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2004 | B1 | EP1064139 | 03.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4081698 | 18.03.1998 | US9900930 | 15.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1060007 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2003 | B1 | EP1060007 | 20.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3538898 | 05.03.1998 | US9904851 | 02.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU763908B | Global Dossier | 07.08.2003 | B2 | AU4007500 | 28.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12345999 | 09.03.1999 | US0006181 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU749058B | Global Dossier | 20.06.2002 | B2 | AU3089699 | 11.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US4097998 | 18.03.1998 | US9905626 | 17.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU747589B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2002 | B2 | AU2802499 | 20.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US3538898 | 05.03.1998 | US9904851 | 02.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU746089B | Global Dossier | 18.04.2002 | B2 | AU2322399 | 11.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US4081698 | 18.03.1998 | US9900930 | 15.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU740112B | Global Dossier | 01.11.2001 | B2 | AU2113399 | 30.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US2229598 | 11.02.1998 | US9900638 | 12.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1056532 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2229598 | 11.02.1998 | US9900638 | 12.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0010458 | 08.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US12345999 | 09.03.1999 | US0006181 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9907982 | 17.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US2229598 | 11.02.1998 | US9900638 | 12.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9908383 | 10.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US3538898 | 05.03.1998 | US9904851 | 02.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9908802 | 31.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US4081698 | 18.03.1998 | US9900930 | 15.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9908855 | 31.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US4097998 | 18.03.1998 | US9905626 | 17.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE1066106T | 06.09.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US4097998 | 18.03.1998 | US9905626 | 17.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60014595T | 09.03.2006 | T2 | DE60014595D1 | 11.11.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US12345999 | 09.03.1999 | US0006181 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69909445T | 15.04.2004 | T2 | DE69909445D1 | 14.08.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US3538898 | 05.03.1998 | US9904851 | 02.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69917013T | 31.03.2005 | T2 | DE69917013D1 | 09.06.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US4081698 | 18.03.1998 | US9900930 | 15.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6513666 | 04.02.2003 | B2 | US2001017280 | 30.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4318197 | 11.04.1997 | US76476701 | 17.01.2001 | US4097998 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6776940 | 17.08.2004 | B2 | US2002130435 | 19.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4318197 | 11.04.1997 | US2229598 | 11.02.1998 | US4081698 | 18.03.1998 | US12345999 | 09.03.1999 | US4097998 | 18.03.1998 | US4782801 | 23.10.2001 | US52245200 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003038391 | 27.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US41249499 | 05.10.1999 | US87150101 | 31.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6090441 | 18.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US4081698 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6264044 | 24.07.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US4318197 | 11.04.1997 | US4097998 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6267916 | 31.07.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US2229598 | 11.02.1998 | US41249499 | 05.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6280791 | 28.08.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US4318197 | 11.04.1997 | US70612500 | 03.11.2000 | US3538898 | 05.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6413070 | 02.07.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US4318197 | 11.04.1997 | US2229598 | 11.02.1998 | US4081698 | 18.03.1998 | US12345999 | 09.03.1999 | US4097998 | 18.03.1998 | US41249499 | 05.10.1999 | US52245200 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9941001 | Global Dossier | 19.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2229598 | 11.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6056529 | 02.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US2229598 | 11.02.1998 |