EP1056532 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PRODUCING A PLURALITY OF DIFFERENT MICROPOROUS PHASE INVERSION MEMBRANES EACH HAVING ANY ONE OF A PLURALITY OF DIFFERENT PORES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Cuno Incorporated 400 Research Parkway Meriden Connecticut 06450 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYERING, Mark, T. 119 Hubbard Street Middlefield, CT 06455 / US | 02 /
KELLY, William, R. 10 South Main Street Moravia, NY 13118 / US | 03 /
WALLACE, Jospeh G. Apartment 120, 1160 South Main Street Middletown, CT 06457 / US | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2002/12] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/49] | Gahlert, Stefan, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99901439.2 | 12.01.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999US00638 | Priority number, date | US19980022295 | 11.02.1998 Original published format: US 22295 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9941001 | Date: | 19.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1056532 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, B01D71/56 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
B01D71/56 (EP,US);
B01D67/00113 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D2323/12 (EP,US);
B01D2325/341 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2000/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR PRODUKTION EINER VIELZAHL VON UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN MIKROPORÖSEN PHASEN-INVERSIONS-MEMBRANEN MIT JEWEILS UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN PORENGRÖSSEN | [2000/49] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PRODUCING A PLURALITY OF DIFFERENT MICROPOROUS PHASE INVERSION MEMBRANES EACH HAVING ANY ONE OF A PLURALITY OF DIFFERENT PORES | [2000/49] | French: | PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PLURALITE DE MEMBRANES A INVERSION DE PHASE MICROPOREUSES DIFFERENTES PRESENTANT CHACUNE DES PORES PARMI PLUSIEURS PORES DIFFERENTS | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 03.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/05] | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.03.2001 | 31.01.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4340479 (PALL DAVID B); | [A]US4707266 (DEGEN PETER J [US], et al); | [AD]US4770777 (STEADLY HARVEY [US], et al); | [A]WO9200137 (CUNO INC [US]); | [XD]US5215662 (JOHNSON JAMES S [US], et al) |