EP1053539 - AUGMENTED RETINAL DISPLAY WITH VIEW TRACKING AND DATA POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Washington Seattle, WA 98195 / US | [2000/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELVILLE, Charles, D. 3631 - 241st Avenue S.E. Issaquah, WA 98029 / US | 02 /
JOHNSTON, Richard, S. 25524 S.E. 28th Street Issaquah, WA 98029 / US | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/47] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99901452.5 | 13.01.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999US00726 | Priority number, date | US19980009579 | 20.01.1998 Original published format: US 9579 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9936903 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053539 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00, H04N9/47, G02B27/01 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
G02B27/01 (EP,US);
G09G5/00 (KR);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G02B27/0172 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0187 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/47] | G09G5/00, H04N9/47 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/47] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE NETZHAUTBILDANZEIGE MIT BLICKVERFOLGUNG UND DATENPOSITIONIERUNG | [2000/47] | English: | AUGMENTED RETINAL DISPLAY WITH VIEW TRACKING AND DATA POSITIONING | [2000/47] | French: | IMAGEUR RETINIEN AVANCE A POURSUITE DU REGARD ET POSITIONNEMENT DE DONNEES | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 21.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 07.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08156646 ; | [A]US3867633 (PATRICK THOMAS R, et al) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [X]US4028725 (LEWIS EDGAR B) [X] 9-13 * column 4, line 17 - column 6, line 41; figure 3 *; | [DA]US5557444 (MELVILLE CHARLES D [US], et al); | [DA]US5596339 (FURNESS III THOMAS A [US], et al); | [A]EP0770370 (IR VISION INC [US]) [A] 3,8 * abstract * * column 5, line 27 - line 42 * * column 5, line 51 - line 54 * * column 15, line 55 - column 16, line 6 *; | [PX]US5734357 (MATSUMOTO TSUYOSHI [JP]) [PX] 1,2,5-7,14-17,19,20 * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 15; figure 5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08156646 A 19960618 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,2,6,7,14-17,19,20 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5355181 (ASHIZAKI KOJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5587836 (TAKAHASHI KOICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5653751 (SAMIY NASSROLLAH [US], et al) | by applicant | US4028725 |