EP1049622 - SHIP RIG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olsen Design APS Ernst Carlsensvej 12 7000 Fredericia / DK | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSEN, Steen, Christian Ernst Carlsensvej 12 DK-7000 Fredericia / DK | 02 /
NIELSEN, Jorn, Steen Eghoj 5 Ramlose DK-3200 Helsinge / DK | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Holme, Edvard Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Holme, Edvard Holme Patent A/S, Vesterbrogade 20 1620 Copenhagen V. / DK | Application number, filing date | 99901581.1 | 22.01.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999DK00033 | Priority number, date | DK19980000093 | 23.01.1998 Original published format: DK 9398 | [2000/45] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937537 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049622 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B63H9/06 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
B63H9/10 (EP);
B63H9/0615 (EP);
B63H2009/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | RIGG FÜR EIN SCHIFF | [2000/45] | English: | SHIP RIG | [2000/45] | French: | GREEMENT DE BATEAU | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1999 | Translation filed | 23.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 01.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/06] | 05.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4506620 (GERR STANLEY [US]); | [X]DE3718414 (BLOHM VOSS AG [DE]); | [A]US4546718 (SCHWARZ HARTMUT B [DE]); | [A]US4269134 (SHAPLAND EARL P); | [A]FR2410599 (VICARD PIERRE G [FR]) |