EP1053593 - FILTER WITH SURFACE ACOUSTIC WAVE RESONATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 173, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/40] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLAL, Marc, Thomson-CSF PI Dépt. 13, avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 02 /
DESBOIS, Jean, Thomson-CSF PI Dépt. 13, avenue du Président Salvador Alende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2000/47] | Application number, filing date | 99901689.2 | 02.02.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999FR00214 | Priority number, date | FR19980001419 | 06.02.1998 Original published format: FR 9801419 | [2000/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940678 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053593 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053593 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/64 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
H03H9/0028 (EP,KR,US);
H03H9/1455 (EP,KR,US);
H03H9/14564 (EP,KR,US);
H03H9/14532 (EP,KR,US);
H03H9/14547 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | RESONATORFILTER MIT AKUSTISCHEN OBERFLÄCHENWELLEN | [2000/47] | English: | FILTER WITH SURFACE ACOUSTIC WAVE RESONATORS | [2000/47] | French: | FILTRE A RESONATEURS A ONDES ACOUSTIQUES DE SURFACE | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 12.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5508667 (KONDRATIEV SERGUEI [CH], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |