EP1052989 - USE OF 2-AMINO-6- TRIFLUOROMEHTHOXY- BENZOTHIAZOLE FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING CEREBELLUM DYSFUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [2000/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHME, Andrees 32, rue Vitruve F-75020 Paris / FR | 02 /
BOIREAU, Alain 80, rue Porchefontaine F-94370 Sucy en Brie / FR | 03 /
CANTON, Thierry 1, avenue André Toutain F-93270 Sevran / FR | 04 /
IMPERATO, Assunta 195 bis, rue Raymond Losserand F-75014 Paris / FR | [2000/47] | Application number, filing date | 99901703.1 | 03.02.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999FR00230 | Priority number, date | FR19980001402 | 06.02.1998 Original published format: FR 9801402 | [2000/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9939710 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052989 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052989 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/425, A61P21/00, A61P25/14 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/428 (EP,US);
A61K31/425 (KR);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/47] | A61K31/425 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON 2-AMINO-6-TRIFLUOROMETHOXYBENZOTHIAZOL ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARZNEIMITTELS ZUR VORBEUGUNG ODER BEHANDLUNG VON ZEREBELLUMKRANKHEITEN | [2003/05] | English: | USE OF 2-AMINO-6- TRIFLUOROMEHTHOXY- BENZOTHIAZOLE FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING CEREBELLUM DYSFUNCTION | [2000/47] | French: | APPLICATION DU 2-AMINO-6- TRIFLUOROMETHOXY- BENZOTHIAZOLE POUR LA PREVENTION OU LE TRAITEMENT DES DYSFONCTIONNEMENTS DU CERVELET | [2000/47] |
Former [2000/47] | VERWENDUNG VON 2-AMINO-6-TRIFLUOROMETHOXYBENZOTHIAZOLE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARZNEIMITTELS ZUR VORBEUGUNG ODER BEHANDLUNG VON ZEREBELLUMKRANKHEITEN | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - DEBONO ET AL, "electrophysiological studies of the effects of riluzole on purkinje cells in cerebellar slices", BR J PHARMACOL, (1989), vol. 97, page 584, XP002081721 [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - DESSI ET AL, "riluzole prevents anoxic injury in cultured cerebellar granule neurons", EUR. J. OF PHARM., (1993), vol. 250, no. 2, pages 325 - 328, XP002081722 [A] 1-4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(93)90398-2 |