blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0985539

EP0985539 - OPTICAL PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO., LTD.
1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome Nishitokyo-shi
Tokyo / JP
[2007/42]
Former [2007/01]For all designated states
CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD.
1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome, Nishitokyo-shi
Tokyo 188-8511 / JP
Former [2001/47]For all designated states
Citizen Watch Co. Ltd.
1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome, Nishitokyo-shi
Tokyo 188-8511 / JP
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
Citizen Watch Co., Ltd.
1-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0428 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MASUBUCHI, Sadao, Citizen Watch Co., Ltd.
Gijyutsukenkyusho, 840, Aza-Takeno, Oaza-Shimotomi
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-0001 / JP
02 / FUTAKAMI, Shigeru, Citizen Watch Co., Ltd.
Gijyutsukenkyusho, 840, Aza-Takeno, Oaza-Shimotomi
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-0001 / JP
03 / MATSUNAGA, Masaaki, Citizen Watch Co., Ltd.
Gijyutsukenkyusho, 840, Aza-Takeno, Oaza-Shimotomi
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-0001 / JP
04 / YOKOYAMA, Masafumi, Citizen Watch Co., Ltd.
Gijyutsukenkyusho, 840, Aza-Takeno, Oaza-Shimotomi
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-0001 / JP
05 / SHIOTA, Akira, Citizen Watch Co., Ltd.
Gijyutsukenkyusho, 840, Aza-Takeno, Oaza-Shimotomi
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-0001 / JP
06 / NONAKA, Shinichi, Citizen Watch Co., Ltd.
Tanashiseizousho, 1-12, Honcho 6-chome
Tanashi-shi, Tokyo 188-0011 / JP
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Waldren, Robin Michael, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]Waldren, Robin Michael, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99901919.329.01.1999
[2000/11]
WO1999JP00395
Priority number, dateJP1998001891730.01.1998         Original published format: JP 1891798
[2000/11]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9938698
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0985539
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0985539
Date:03.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2001
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/445
[2000/11]
CPC:
B41J2/525 (EP,US); B41J2/45 (EP,US); B41J2/473 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [2006/49]
Former [2000/11]DE,  FR,  GB 
TitleGerman:OPTISCHER DRUCKER[2000/11]
English:OPTICAL PRINTER[2000/11]
French:IMPRIMANTE OPTIQUE[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase29.01.1999Translation filed 
07.10.1999National basic fee paid 
07.10.1999Search fee paid 
07.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/11]
03.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2005Fee for grant paid
09.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5621453  (FUJITA YASUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 43 - line 63 *;
 [A]EP0393598  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,20 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 22 * * figures 2,5 *
International search[A]JPH0280271  (NIPPON DENKI HOME ELECTRONICS);
 [A]JPS63123021  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.