blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0978565

EP0978565 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PEPTIDE WITH THE USE OF ACCESSORY PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asubio Pharma Co., Ltd.
9-11 Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2007/41]
Former [2007/21]For all designated states
Asubio Pharma Co., Ltd.
9-11 Akasaka 2 chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2005/52]For all designated states
Daiichi Asubio Pharma Co., Ltd.
9-11, Akasaka 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8541 / JP
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Daiichi Suntory Pharma Co., Ltd.
7-2, Kojimachi 5-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
SUNTORY LIMITED
1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8203 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OHSUYE, Kazuhiro
243, Takara-cho
Ohta-shi, Gunma 373-0042 / JP
02 / YABUTA, Masayuki
743-88, Nishimisono-cho
Tatebayashi-shi, Gunma 374-0038 / JP
03 / SUZUKI, Yuji
3011-1, Horigome-cho
Ashikaga-shi, Tochigi 326-0831 / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99901926.829.01.1999
[2000/06]
WO1999JP00406
Priority number, dateJP1998003227230.01.1998         Original published format: JP 3227298
[2000/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9938984
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978565
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978565
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2003
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/62, C12P21/02, C12P21/06, A61K38/28, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C07K14/605
[2003/18]
CPC:
C12N15/62 (EP,KR); A61P3/10 (EP); A61P5/50 (EP);
C07K14/605 (EP); C12N15/00 (KR); C07K2319/50 (EP);
C07K2319/75 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2000/06]C12N15/62, C12P21/02, C12P21/06, A61K38/28, C12N1/21, C12N5/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PEPTIDS MITTELS EINES HILFSPEPTIDS[2000/06]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PEPTIDE WITH THE USE OF ACCESSORY PEPTIDE[2000/06]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PEPTIDE AU MOYEN D'UN PEPTIDE ACCESSOIRE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase11.10.1999Translation filed 
19.10.1999National basic fee paid 
19.10.1999Search fee paid 
19.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/11]
22.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2006Date of oral proceedings
16.01.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2007Fee for grant paid
28.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
24.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
23.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
GR11.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
LU29.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
[2010/28]
Former [2010/19]CY10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
GR11.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2010/06]CY10.10.2007
GR11.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2009/13]GR11.01.2008
ES21.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/40]ES21.01.2008
MC31.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/24]ES21.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[T]  - SUZUKI Y ET AL, "Effect of amino acid substitution at the P(3) and P(4) subsites of fusion proteins on kex2 protease activity.", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY. ENGLAND AUG 2000, (200008), vol. 32 ( Pt 1), ISSN 0885-4513, pages 53 - 60, XP009007087

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BA20000012
 [A]  - MOTIN V L ET AL, "IMMUNIZATION WITH A PEPTIDE CORRESPONDING TO CHLAMYDIAL HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN 60 INCREASES THE HUMORAL IMMUNE RESPONSE IN C3H MICE TO A PEPTIDE REPRESENTING VARIABLE DOMAIN 4 OF THE MAJOR OUTER MEMBRANE PROTEIN OF CHLAMYDIA TRACHOMATIS", CLINICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORY IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (199905), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1071-412X, pages 356 - 363, XP000881951 [A] * abstract *
International search[X]JPH05328992  (SUNTORY LTD);
 [X]JPH08187094  (SUNTORY LTD);
 [X]JPH09296000  (SUNTORY LTD [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.