EP1060421 - N-PORT RECONFIGURABLE DWDM MULTIPLEXER AND DEMULTIPLEXER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KECK, Donald, B. Chequers Circle Big Flats, NY 14814 / US | 02 /
NOLAN, Daniel, A. 28 Skyline Drive Corning, NY 14830 / US | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Grunfeld, David Peter Corning Limited Patents and Licensing Department Quantum House Maylands Avenue Hemel Hempstead, Herts. HP2 7DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Grunfeld, David Peter Corning Limited, Patents and Licensing Department, Quantum House, Maylands Avenue Hemel Hempstead, Herts. HP2 7DE / GB | ||
Former [2000/51] | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife Beacon House, 113 Kingsway London WC2B 6PP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99902092.8 | 07.01.1999 | [2000/51] | WO1999US00298 | Priority number, date | US19980071730P | 16.01.1998 Original published format: US 71730 P | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9936817 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1060421 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/26 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
G02B6/12011 (EP,US);
G02B6/12007 (EP,US);
G02B6/2935 (EP,US);
G02B6/29395 (EP,US);
H04J14/02 (US);
H04J14/03 (EP);
G02B6/29358 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/51] | Title | German: | REKONFIGURUERBARER DWDM MULTIPLEXER UND DEMULTIPLEXER MIT N-TOREN | [2000/51] | English: | N-PORT RECONFIGURABLE DWDM MULTIPLEXER AND DEMULTIPLEXER | [2000/51] | French: | MULTIPLEXEUR ET DEMULTIPLEXEUR DE TYPE "DWDM" RECONFIGURABLES A N PORTS | [2000/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 01.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/21] | 16.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5243672 (DRAGONE CORRADO [US]); | [A]US5396507 (KAMINOW IVAN P [US], et al); | [X]US5414548 (TACHIKAWA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al); | [AE]US5862279 (AMERSFOORT MARTIN R [US], et al) |