EP1050167 - REGION-BASED INFORMATION COMPACTION FOR DIGITAL IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akikaze Technologies, LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2007/20] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REITMEIER, Glenn, A. 193 Cinnabar Lane Yardley, PA 19067 / US | 02 /
TINKER, Michael 35 Highland Drive Yardley, PA 19067 / US | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/45] | Pratt, Richard Wilson D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99902104.1 | 19.01.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999US00351 | Priority number, date | US19980071296P | 16.01.1998 Original published format: US 71296 P | US19980071294P | 16.01.1998 Original published format: US 71294 P | US19980050304 | 30.03.1998 Original published format: US 50304 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937096 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050167 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050167 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
H04N19/98 (EP,US);
H04N19/134 (KR);
H04N19/103 (EP,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/20 (EP,US);
H04N19/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/45] | Title | German: | BEREICHSBASIERTE INFORMATIONSKOMPRESSION FÜR DIGITALE BILDER | [2000/45] | English: | REGION-BASED INFORMATION COMPACTION FOR DIGITAL IMAGES | [2000/45] | French: | COMPACTAGE D'INFORMATIONS BASEES SUR UNE ZONE POUR IMAGES NUMERIQUES | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 08.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 25.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Request for further processing for: | 25.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.11.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.12.2008 | NL | 17.12.2008 | [2011/28] |
Former [2009/30] | NL | 17.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9747139 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 5, line 27 - page 7, line 33 * * page 14, line 15 - line 30 *; | [X]EP0630158 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 52 *; | [XA]US5049990 (KONDO TETSUJIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 34 - line 58; figures 1-4; claim - * [A] 3-10; | [A]US4947447 (MIYAOKA SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5392072 (RODRIGUEZ ARTURO A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [X] - CHEN T ET AL, "CODING OF SUBREGIONS FOR CONTENT-BASED SCALABLE VIDEO", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (199702), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 256 - 260, XP000678899 [X] 1,2,5-8 * page 258, paragraph IV.A; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.554441 |