EP1047635 - PROCESS FOR MAKING SILANIZED COLLOIDAL SILICA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENDREON CORPORATION 3005 1st Avenue Seattle, WA 98121 / US | [2002/34] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states DENDREON CORPORATION 291 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN VLASSELAER, Peter 1065 Hickory Nut Court Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
HASAN, Shirin, W. 777 Hollenbeck Avenue, 8H Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/44] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99902116.5 | 07.01.1999 | [2000/44] | WO1999US00403 | Priority number, date | US19980006775 | 14.01.1998 Original published format: US 6775 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9936359 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047635 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1047635 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/149, C09C1/30, // (C12N5/00, G01N33:552) | [2000/44] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09C1/3081 (EP,US);
C01B33/149 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SILANISIERTER KOLLOIDALER KIESELSÄURE | [2002/41] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING SILANIZED COLLOIDAL SILICA | [2000/44] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE SILICE COLLOIDALE SILANISEE | [2000/44] |
Former [2000/44] | VERFAHREN ZU HERSTELLUNG VON SILANISIERTER KOLLOIDALER KIESELSÄURE | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2786042 (ILER RALPH K); | [A]FR2029461 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH); | [A]EP0306862 (DOW CORNING [US]); | [DA]US4927749 (DORN ALLAN R [US]) [DA] 1,3,4,9,10 * claims 1-11 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 24 * * column 8, line 21 - column 11, line 23 * * example 1 *; | [A]EP0475132 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 6,13 * |