Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1049680
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.12.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] |
30.08.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
04.03.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
13.02.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.09.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] |
22.09.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] |
01.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|