EP1049680 - SUBSTITUTED AMINOALKYLIDENAMINO TRIAZINES AS HERBICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | For all designated states NIHON BAYER AGROCHEM K.K. 10-8, Takanawa 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
For all designated states NIHON BAYER AGROCHEM K.K. 10-8, Takanawa 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEBEL, Hans-Jochem In der Beek 92 D-42113 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
KIRSTEN, Rolf Carl-Langhans-Strasse 27 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 03 /
LEHR, Stefan Am Benthal 54 D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
VOIGT, Katharina Grossheidstrasse 121 D-52080 Aachen / DE | 05 /
DOLLINGER, Markus 13210 Knox Overland Park, KS 66213 / US | 06 /
DREWES, Mark, Wilhelm Goethestrasse 38 D-40764 Langenfeld / DE | 07 /
WETCHOLOWSKY, Ingo Insterstrasse 12 D-51371 Leverkusen / DE | 08 /
WATANABE, Yukiyoshi Hanagaki-cho 2-8-24 Oyama-shi, Tochigi 323 / JP | 09 /
KIDO, Kaori 16 Winslow Road 1 Brookline, MA 02246 / US | 10 /
GOTO, Toshio Koganei 214-18, Kokubunji Shimotsuga-gun, Tochigi 329-04 / JP | 11 /
MINEGISHI, Natsuko Wakagi-cho 1-9-31, Oyama-shi Tochigi 323-0028 / JP | 12 /
MYERS, Randy, Allen Heltorfer Mark 47 D-40489 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Bader, Axel Jochen, et al Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Bader, Axel Jochen, et al Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99902527.3 | 09.01.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999EP00095 | Priority number, date | DE1998102236 | 22.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19802236 | [2000/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937627 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049680 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/18, C07D401/12, C07D409/12, C07D405/12, A01N43/70, A01N43/68 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,KR);
C07D251/18 (EP,KR);
A01N43/68 (KR);
C07D213/26 (KR);
C07D213/64 (KR);
C07D307/81 (KR);
C07D333/20 (KR);
C07D333/28 (KR);
C07D405/12 (EP,KR);
C07D409/12 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/45] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE AMINOALKYLIDENAMINOTRIAZINE ALS HERBIZIDE | [2000/45] | English: | SUBSTITUTED AMINOALKYLIDENAMINO TRIAZINES AS HERBICIDES | [2000/45] | French: | AMINOALKYLIDENAMINOTRIAZINES SUBSTITUEES UTILISEES COMME HERBICIDES | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 01.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/06] | 04.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6351379 ; | [X]CH601999 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 1,7-10 * claim 1 *; | [AD]WO9708156 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,7-10 * claim - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880727), vol. 012, no. 270, Database accession no. (C - 515), & JP63051379 A 19880304 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * abstract * | [X] - KITAN, D. ET AL, "The synthesis of 1,3,5-triazinylformamidines,-formamide oximes and -methylcyanoamines", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880523), vol. 108, no. 21, Database accession no. 186701, XP002099767 [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMABS, Chemical Abstracts Service, XP002099768 [ ] * siehe N'-[4-chloro-6-[(2-phenylethyl) amino]- 1,3,5-triazin-2-yl]-N,N-dimethyl- methanimidamide (RN=11409-50-6) * | [ ] - VESTN. SLOV. KEM. DRUS. (1987), 34(2), 217-32 ;ISSN: 0560-3110 |