blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980706

EP0980706 - OXIDATION CATALYST SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OXIDATION WITH THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2010
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.2010  [2010/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd.
Mainichi Intecio 3-4-5, Umeda Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-0001 / JP
[2008/01]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd.
1, Teppo-cho, Sakai-shi
Osaka 590-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ISHII, Yasutaka
19-21, Bessyohonmachi
Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1112 / JP
02 / NAKANO, Tatsuya
6-20, Nakanomachi Shinzaike
Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0094 / JP
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99902869.910.02.1999
[2000/08]
WO1999JP00566
Priority number, dateJP1998005444318.02.1998         Original published format: JP 5444398
[2000/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9942211
Date:26.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980706
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980706
Date:03.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2005
ClassificationIPC:B01J31/02, B01J31/24, B01J31/28, B01J23/46, C07C45/38, C07C45/39, C07C47/347
[2005/33]
CPC:
B01J31/2404 (EP,US); B01J23/46 (KR); B01J31/0202 (EP,US);
B01J31/0208 (EP,US); C07C45/38 (EP,US); C07C45/39 (EP,US);
C07C47/347 (EP,US); B01J2231/763 (EP,US); B01J23/462 (EP,US);
B01J2531/821 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2000/08]B01J23/46, B01J31/24, C07C45/38, C07C47/055, C07C49/04, C07C47/34
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/08]
TitleGerman:KATALYSATOR FÜR OXIDATION UND VERFAHREN ZUR OXIDATION MIT DEM KATALYSATOR[2000/08]
English:OXIDATION CATALYST SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OXIDATION WITH THE SAME[2000/08]
French:CATALYSEUR D'OXYDATION ET PROCEDE D'OXYDATION VIA CE CATALYSEUR[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase18.10.1999Translation filed 
18.10.1999National basic fee paid 
18.10.1999Search fee paid 
18.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
17.08.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2009Fee for grant paid
20.04.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.03.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0175574  (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) [X] 1 * example -; claim 1 *;
 [Y]GB2312209  (ZENECA LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-4 * example -; claim 1 *;
 [XY]  - BACKVALL J E ET AL, "RUTHENIUM-CATALYSED AEROBIC OXIDATION OF ALCOHOLS VIA MULTISTEP ELECTRON TRANSFER", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (19910401), no. 7, ISSN 0022-4936, pages 473 - 475, XP000179434 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 1-4

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c39910000473
 [DXY]  - BÄCKVALL J E ET AL, "Aerobic oxidation of secondary alcohols via ruthenium-catalyzed hydrogen transfer involving a new triple catalytic system", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (1994), no. 9, pages 1037 - 1038, XP009049751 [DX] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 1-4
 [Y]  - LENZ R ET AL, "TETRA-N-PROPYLAMMONIUM PERRUTHENATE (TPAP)-CATALYSED OXIDATIONS OF ALCOHOLS USING MOLECULAR OXYGEN AS A CO-OXIDANT", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (1997), vol. 22, ISSN 0300-922X, pages 3291 - 3292, XP002928418 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a707339i
 [X]  - BILGRIEN C ET AL, "The Selective Oxidation of Primary Alcohols to Aldehydes by O2 Employing a Trinuclear Ruthenium Carboxylate Catalyst", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19870610), vol. 109, no. 12, pages 3786 - 3787, XP002333701 [X] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00246a049
 [PX]  - HANYU A ET AL, "Selective Aerobic Oxidation of Primary Alcohols Catalyzed by a Ru(PPh3)3Cl2/Hydroquinone System", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980730), vol. 39, no. 31, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 5557 - 5560, XP004124115 [PX] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(98)01119-8
International search[A]JPS5748931  (NIPPON ZEON CO);
 [A]JPS6165835  (NIPPON KASEI CHEM);
 [X]JPS62223145  (SHELL INT RESEARCH);
 [A]JPH01305053  (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.