EP1054986 - ISOLATED AND PURIFIED NUCLEIC ACIDS COMPRISING A GENE SPECIFICALLY EXPRESSED IN HOP GLANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAPPORO BREWERIES LTD. 20-1, Ebisu 4-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8686 / JP | [2007/44] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states SAPPORO BREWERIES LTD. 20-1, Ebisu 4-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Yukio, Sapporo Breweries Ltd Plant Bioeng. Res. La., 37-1, Kizaki, Nitta-cho Nitta-gun, Gunma 370-0321 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Kazutoshi, Sapporo Breweries Ltd Plant Bioeng. Res. Lab., 37-1, Kizaki, Nitta-cho Nitta-gun, Gunma 370-0321 / JP | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99902914.3 | 16.02.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999JP00658 | Priority number, date | JP19980037266 | 19.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3726698 | JP19980174235 | 22.06.1998 Original published format: JP 17423598 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9942599 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1054986 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1054986 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N15/54, C12N9/10, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, A01H5/00 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
C12N9/1037 (EP,US);
C12N15/8222 (EP,US);
C12N15/8233 (EP,US);
C12N15/8243 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/48] | Title | German: | ISOLIERTE UND AUFGEREINIGTE NUKLEINSÄUREN, WELCHE EIN GEN ENTHALTEN, WELCHES IN HOPFENDRÜSEN EXPRIMIERT WIRD | [2000/48] | English: | ISOLATED AND PURIFIED NUCLEIC ACIDS COMPRISING A GENE SPECIFICALLY EXPRESSED IN HOP GLANDS | [2000/48] | French: | ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ISOLES ET PURIFIES COMPRENANT UN GENE EXPRIME SPECIFIQUEMENT DANS LES GLANDES DU HOUBLON | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 20.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.10.2007 | CY | 31.10.2007 | DK | 31.10.2007 | FI | 31.10.2007 | NL | 31.10.2007 | SE | 31.01.2008 | LU | 16.02.2008 | IT | 29.02.2008 | [2011/28] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CY | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
LU | 16.02.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CY | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | NL | 31.10.2007 | |
SE | 31.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A] - FUNG, S.Y., ET AL., "conversion of dehumulone into the hop alpha-acid humulone", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (199703), vol. 44, no. 6, pages 1047 - 1053, XP002106370 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(96)00671-1 | [A] - ZUURBIER,K.W.M., ET AL., "formation of aromatic intermediates in the biosynthesis of bitter acids in Humulus lupulus", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (199501), vol. 38, no. 1, pages 77 - 82, XP002106371 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(94)00614-Y | [PX] - OKADA, Y., "a chalcone synthase-like gene expressed specifically in lupulin glands of hop (humulus lupulus)", EMBL SEQUENCE DATA LIBRARY, heidelberg, germany, (19980623), XP002106372 [PX] 1-6 * accession no. AB015430 * | [T] - PANIEGO,N.B.,ET AL., "Phlorisovalerophenone synthase, a novel polyketide synthase from hop (Humulus lupulus L.) cones", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (199906), vol. 262, pages 612 - 616, XP002106373 [T] 1-18 * abstract; page 612;page 616, left column; Table 1; Fig. 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1327.1999.00444.x |