EP1048151 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING DELAYS INDEPENDENT OF SWITCH SIZE IN A CROSSBAR SWITCH WITH SPEEDUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENTERASYS NETWORKS, INC. 35 Industrial Way Rochester, NH 03867 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states Enterasys Networks, Inc. 35 Industrial Way Rochester, NH 03867 / US | ||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states CABLETRON SYSTEMS, INC. 35 Industrial Way Rochester, NH 03867 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARNY, Anna 408 Dutton Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 02 /
KRISHNA, Pattabhiraman 21 Royal Crest Drive 9 Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | 03 /
PATEL, Naimish 32 Monteiro Way N. Andover, MA 01845 / US | 04 /
SIMCOE, Robert, J. 11 Brookway Road Westboro, MA 01581 / US | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99903061.2 | 12.01.1999 | [2000/44] | WO1999US00684 | Priority number, date | US19980005740 | 12.01.1998 Original published format: US 5740 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9935792 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1048151 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04Q11/04 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
H04L49/254 (EP);
H04Q11/0478 (EP);
H04L49/101 (EP);
H04L49/3018 (EP);
H04L49/3027 (EP);
H04L49/3045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KOPPELFELDGRÖSSE-UNABHÄNGIGEN VERZÖGERUNG IM KREUTZSCHIENENKOPPELFELD MIT ERHÖHTER GESCHWINDIGKEIT | [2000/44] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING DELAYS INDEPENDENT OF SWITCH SIZE IN A CROSSBAR SWITCH WITH SPEEDUP | [2000/44] | French: | PROCEDE ASSURANT DES DELAIS INDEPENDANTS DE LA TAILLE DES REPARTITEURS DANS UN CENTRAL CROSSBAR ACCELERE | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 05.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/08] | 22.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2293720 (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 24 *; | [A]EP0817436 (XEROX CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, line 49 - page 8, line 53 *; | [A]WO9731460 (HAL COMPUTER SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 25 * |