EP1047443 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ENHANCING COGNITIVE FUNCTION USING MORPHOGENIC PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curis, Inc. 61 Moulton Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2001/19] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states CREATIVE BIOMOLECULES, INC. 45 South Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARETTE, Marc, F. 18 Ellicott Street Needham, MA 02192 / US | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [2000/44] | Schlich, George William, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99903241.0 | 21.01.1999 | [2000/44] | WO1999US01232 | Priority number, date | US19980012846 | 23.01.1998 Original published format: US 12846 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937320 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047443 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, A61K48/00 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
A61K38/1875 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | METHODEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG KOGNITIVER FUNKTIONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG MORPHOGENER PROTEINE | [2000/44] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ENHANCING COGNITIVE FUNCTION USING MORPHOGENIC PROTEINS | [2000/44] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR AMELIORER LA FONCTION COGNITIVE AU MOYEN DE PROTEINES MORPHOGENIQUES | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/51] | Divisional application(s) | EP03023804.2 / EP1398039 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5652118 (OZKAYNAK ENGIN [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * column 3, line 4 - line 30 * * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 23 * * column 6, line 31 - column 7, line 14 * * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 21 * * column 8, line 43 - line 66 * * column 10, line 57 - line 62 * * column 13, line 49 - line 58 * * column 14, line 52 - line 56 * * column 15, line 8 - line 11 * * column 18, line 11 - line 29 * * column 32, line 15 - line 21 *; | [DX]WO9403200 (CREATIVE BIOMOLECULES INC [US]) [DX] 1-25 * abstract * * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 19 * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 15 * * page 8, line 4 - line 17 * * page 10, line 6 - page 17, line 4 * * page 17, line 27 - page 19, line 3 * * page 19, line 24 - line 26 * * page 20, line 21 - page 21, line 14 * * page 41, line 11 - line 25 * * page 42, line 27 - page 43, line 22 * * page 55, line 16 - line 26 * * page 59, line 21 - page 60, line 5 * * page 63, line 16 - page 65, line 28 * * page 68, line 14 - line 17 * * page 79, line 25 - page 81, line 15 * * page 82, line 1 - page 89, line 34 * * page 98, line 31 - page 99, line 12 * * claims 1-93 *; | [X]WO9505846 (GENETICS INST [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12,14-19,21-26 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - line 14 * * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, line 22 - line 29 * * page 5, line 5 - line 15 * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 17 * * page 8, line 9 - line 16 * * claims 1-21 *; | [DX]WO9734626 (CREATIVE BIOMOLECULES INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-24 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * page 3, line 24 - page 8, line 2 * * page 11, line 5 - page 13, line 2 * * page 15, line 22 - line 30 * * page 16, line 20 - line 31 * * page 25, line 13 - page 28, line 5 * * page 28, line 13 - line 15 * * page 28, line 32 - page 29, line 5 * * claims 1-26 * |