EP1052951 - TUBULAR STENT CONSISTS OF CHEVRON-SHAPE EXPANSION STRUTS AND CONTRALATERALLY ATTACHED DIAGONAL-CONNECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scimed Life Systems, Inc. One SciMed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states SciMed Life Systems, Inc. One SciMed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US | ||
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | ||
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states Jang, G. David 30725 Eastbern Lane Redlands California 92374 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jang, G. David 30725 Eastbern Lane Redlands California 92374 / US | [2004/20] |
Former [2000/47] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Graalfs, Edo Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Graalfs, Edo Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | Graalfs, Edo Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Patentanwälte Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2000/47] | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99903509.0 | 28.01.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999US02050 | Priority number, date | US19980073412P | 02.02.1998 Original published format: US 73412 P | US19990237537 | 26.01.1999 Original published format: US 237537 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9938456 | Date: | 05.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052951 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052951 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91533 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91558 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91583 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | ROHRFÖRMIGER STENT MIT ZICK-ZACK-FÖRMIGEN AUSDEHNUNGSSTREBEN UND AN GEGENÜBERLIEGENDEN SEITEN BEFESTIGTEN DIAGONALVERBINDERN | [2004/18] | English: | TUBULAR STENT CONSISTS OF CHEVRON-SHAPE EXPANSION STRUTS AND CONTRALATERALLY ATTACHED DIAGONAL-CONNECTORS | [2000/47] | French: | EXTENSEUR TUBULAIRE A MONTANTS D'EXPANSION ET ATTACHES DIAGONALES CONTRALATERALES | [2000/47] |
Former [2000/47] | AUS SPARREN BESTENDEN EXPANDIERBAREN STREBEN UND KONTRALATERAL BEFÄSTIGTEN DIAGONALEN VERBINDERN VERSEHENER STENT | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 17.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.05.2004 | BE | 12.05.2004 | CH | 12.05.2004 | FI | 12.05.2004 | IT | 12.05.2004 | LI | 12.05.2004 | DK | 12.08.2004 | GR | 12.08.2004 | SE | 12.08.2004 | ES | 23.08.2004 | PT | 12.10.2004 | CY | 28.01.2005 | LU | 28.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/21] | AT | 12.05.2004 | |
BE | 12.05.2004 | ||
CH | 12.05.2004 | ||
FI | 12.05.2004 | ||
LI | 12.05.2004 | ||
DK | 12.08.2004 | ||
GR | 12.08.2004 | ||
SE | 12.08.2004 | ||
ES | 23.08.2004 | ||
CY | 28.01.2005 | ||
LU | 28.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 12.05.2004 | |
BE | 12.05.2004 | ||
CH | 12.05.2004 | ||
FI | 12.05.2004 | ||
LI | 12.05.2004 | ||
DK | 12.08.2004 | ||
GR | 12.08.2004 | ||
SE | 12.08.2004 | ||
ES | 23.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 12.05.2004 | |
BE | 12.05.2004 | ||
CH | 12.05.2004 | ||
FI | 12.05.2004 | ||
LI | 12.05.2004 | ||
DK | 12.08.2004 | ||
GR | 12.08.2004 | ||
SE | 12.08.2004 | ||
ES | 23.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 12.05.2004 | |
BE | 12.05.2004 | ||
CH | 12.05.2004 | ||
FI | 12.05.2004 | ||
LI | 12.05.2004 | ||
GR | 12.08.2004 | ||
SE | 12.08.2004 | ||
ES | 23.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 12.05.2004 | |
CH | 12.05.2004 | ||
FI | 12.05.2004 | ||
LI | 12.05.2004 | ||
GR | 12.08.2004 | ||
SE | 12.08.2004 | ||
ES | 23.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 12.05.2004 | |
FI | 12.05.2004 | ||
LI | 12.05.2004 | ||
GR | 12.08.2004 | ||
SE | 12.08.2004 | ||
ES | 23.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 12.05.2004 | |
FI | 12.05.2004 | ||
LI | 12.05.2004 | ||
SE | 12.08.2004 | ||
ES | 23.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 12.05.2004 | |
LI | 12.05.2004 | ||
SE | 12.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 12.05.2004 | |
LI | 12.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9732543 (DIVYSIO SOLUTIONS LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1,32 * figures 8,12 * * page 15, line 29 - page 16, line 7 * * page 17, line 25 - page 18, line 31 *; | [AP]WO9840035 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [AP] 1-45 * figures 1,7,12 * * page 8, line 10 - line 27 * * page 9, line 18 - line 27 * * page 10, line 13 - line 25 * * page 11, line 10 - line 22 ** page 13, line 6 - line 21 *; | [AP]WO9901088 (FOUERE ALAIN [FR]) [AP] 1,33 * figures 1,3 * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 16 * * claims 1-6 *; | [EA]WO9915107 (JANG G DAVID [US]) [E] 32 * figure 3 * * page 8, line 13 - page 10, line 2 * * page 11, line 19 - page 13, line 26 * * claim ALL * [A] 1-31,33-45 | by applicant | US5102417 | WO9603092 |