EP1064119 - REVOLVING TRANSFER MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mikron SA Agno Postfach 115 6903 Lugano 3 / CH | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDINI, Guido Parco Campestro CH-6916 Grancia / CH | 02 /
TREIB, Thomas Via Ciona F5 CH-6914 Carona / CH | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Roshardt, Werner Alfred Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Roshardt, Werner Alfred, Dipl.-Phys. Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Schmiedenplatz 5 Postfach 3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 99903575.1 | 23.02.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999CH00083 | Priority number, date | EP19980810148 | 24.02.1998 Original published format: EP 98810148 | [2001/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9943464 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1064119 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064119 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q39/04 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
B23Q1/015 (EP,US);
B23Q39/04 (KR);
B23Q16/08 (EP,US);
B23Q39/042 (EP,US);
B23Q2210/004 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5124 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5128 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5136 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5196 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1494 (EP,US);
Y10T82/25 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2511 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2566 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | RUNDTAKTMASCHINE | [2001/01] | English: | REVOLVING TRANSFER MACHINE | [2001/01] | French: | MACHINE A TRANSFERT ROTATIF | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 09.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05006061.5 / EP1541281 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 03.08.2005 | IE | 03.08.2005 | DK | 03.11.2005 | BE | 28.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | [2013/51] |
Former [2007/21] | FI | 03.08.2005 | |
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | FI | 03.08.2005 | |
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 03.08.2005 | |
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 03.08.2005 | |
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 03.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0785040 (WITZIG & FRANK TURMATIC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * siehe Referenzzeichen 16, 18 und schraffiert geschnittene Stützen;; figure 4 * [A] 3-7; | [X]US5697270 (LINK HELMUT [DE]) [X] 12* column 10, lines 15-25; figure 1 * | Examination | DE4301393 |