EP0972782 - MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY WHICH RECOGNIZES THE OLIGOSACCHARIDE N-GLYCOLYLATED-GALACTOSE-GLUCOSE SIALIC ACID IN MALIGNANT TUMORS, AND COMPOSITION CONTAINING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centro de Inmunologia Molecular Calle 216 y 15, Atabey, Playa Ciudad Habana 12100 / CU | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states Centro de Inmunologia Molecular Calle 216 y 15, Atabey, Playa Ciudad Habana 12100 / CU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARR PEREZ, Adriana, Lacret entre Heredia y Alcalde O'Farril 155, Santos Suárez 10 de Octubre, Ciudad de la Habana 10500 / CU | 02 /
MAZORRA HERRERA, Zaima, Calle B entre 1ra y 3ra No.8, Reparto Pomo de Oro, Guanabacoa Ciudad de la Habana 12900 / CU | 03 /
FERNANDEZ MOLINA, Luis Enrique, Edificio A3 Apart . 13, Calle 180 entre 1ra y 5ta, Reparto Flores Playa, Ciudad de la Habana 12100 / CU | 04 /
VAZQUEZ LOPEZ, Ana Maria Mayia Rodriguez No. 455 entre Carmen y Patrocinio Vibora, Ciudad de la Habana 10500 / CU | 05 /
MULET SIERRA, Ailette Finca El Jibarito, Guayabal Caimito, Provincia Habana / CU | 06 /
PEREZ RODRIGUEZ, Rolando Calle Juan Delgado No. 567, La Vibora 10 de Octubre, Ciudad de la Habana 10500 / CU | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2000/03] | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 99903581.9 | 05.02.1999 | [2000/03] | WO1999CU00001 | Priority number, date | CU19980000022 | 05.02.1998 Original published format: CU 2298 | [2000/03] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940119 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972782 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0972782 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/30, C12N5/20, A61K39/395, A61K47/48, A61K51/10, G01N33/577, G01N33/574 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Extension states | AL | 12.10.1999 | LT | 12.10.1999 | LV | 12.10.1999 | MK | 12.10.1999 | RO | 12.10.1999 | SI | 12.10.1999 | Title | German: | MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER DER DIE OLIGOSACCHARIDE SIALINSÄURE N-GLYCOLIERTE GALACTOSE-GLUCOSE AUF BÖSARTIGE TUMOREN ERKENNT UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DIE DIESER ENTHALTEN | [2000/03] | English: | MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY WHICH RECOGNIZES THE OLIGOSACCHARIDE N-GLYCOLYLATED-GALACTOSE-GLUCOSE SIALIC ACID IN MALIGNANT TUMORS, AND COMPOSITION CONTAINING IT | [2000/03] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL RECONNAISSANT L'OLIGOSACCHARIDE ACIDE SIALIQUE N-GLYCOLYLE-GALACTOSE-GLUCOSE DANS LES TUMEURS MALIGNES ET SA COMPOSITION | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.1999 | Translation filed | 01.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 13.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2002 | 28.02.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.09.2003 | LU | 05.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/23] | LU | 05.02.2004 | |
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | MC | 28.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4965198 (YAMASAKI MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [DA] 1-11 * column W *; | [A]EP0657471 (CENTRO INMUNOLOGIA MOLECULAR [CU]) [A] 1-11 * examples 2-4 * * table 1 ** claims 1,10-14,18,32,33 *; | [DA] - H. OZAWA ET AL., "Generation of murine monoclonal antibodies specific for N-glycolylneuraminic acid-containing gangliosides.", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, New York, NY, USA, (19920501), vol. 294, no. 2, pages 427 - 433, XP002102251 [DA] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-9861(92)90707-4 | [A] - A. CARR ET AL., "Differences in immunological behavior betwen NacGM3 and NGcGM3 gangliosides.", BIOTECNOLOGIA APLICADA, La Habana, Cuba, (1997), vol. 14, no. 1, page 48, XP002102252 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - M. ALFONSO ET AL., "Human anti-ganglioside monoclonal antibodies generated by in vitro immunization.", BIOTECNOLOGIA APLICADA, La Habana, Cuba, (1997), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 45 - 46, XP002102253 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - I. KAWASHIMA ET AL., "Characterization of ganglioside expression in human melanoma cells: Immunological and biochemical analysis.", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, Tokyo, Japan, (199308), vol. 114, no. 2, pages 186 - 193, XP002102254 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * see discussion * |