EP0986836 - COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/12] | For:DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASSEY, Peter, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | White, Andrew Gordon, et al NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd Betchworth House Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | White, Andrew Gordon, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2000/12] | Tangena, Antonius Gerardus Philips Electronics UK Ltd., Cross Oak Lane Red Hill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99903870.6 | 02.03.1999 | [2000/12] | WO1999IB00355 | Priority number, date | GB19980006612 | 28.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9806612 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9950928 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0986836 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986836 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/27 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
H01Q7/005 (EP,US);
H01Q7/00 (KR);
H01Q1/242 (EP,US);
H01Q1/46 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/12] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT | [2000/12] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE | [2000/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATIONS | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 22.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.10.2007 | IT | 31.03.2008 | [2011/28] |
Former [2008/17] | ES | 29.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0538485 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [A]GB2308745 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0817312 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) |