EP1053257 - CARBOXYLATED CELLULOSE ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Benedict, Moonsang 1036 Hanover Court Kingsport, TN 37660-5839 / US | 02 /
KUO, Chung-Ming 2625 Brighton Court Kingsport, TN 37660-5807 / US | 03 /
POSEY-DOWTY, Jessica 521 Hidden Valley Road Kingsport, TN 37663-3405 / US | 04 /
CURTIS, Larry, Gerald 3606 Cimarron Drive Johnson City, TN 37601-1209 / US | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99904194.0 | 22.01.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999US01319 | Priority number, date | US19980019554 | 06.02.1998 Original published format: US 19554 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940120 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053257 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053257 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08B3/06, C08B3/18, C08B15/04, C09D101/02, C09D101/12, C09D101/14, C09D11/00 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
C08B3/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08B15/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08B3/18 (EP,KR,US);
C09D101/02 (EP,US);
C09D101/12 (EP,KR,US);
C09D101/14 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | CARBOXYLIERTE CELLULOSEESTER | [2000/47] | English: | CARBOXYLATED CELLULOSE ESTERS | [2000/47] | French: | ESTERS DE CELLULOSE CARBOXYLES | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.07.2002 | FI | 17.07.2002 | FR | 17.07.2002 | IT | 17.07.2002 | NL | 17.07.2002 | SE | 17.10.2002 | GB | 22.01.2003 | ES | 30.01.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 17.07.2002 | |
FI | 17.07.2002 | ||
FR | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
GB | 22.01.2003 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | BE | 17.07.2002 | |
FI | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
GB | 22.01.2003 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | BE | 17.07.2002 | |
FI | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | BE | 17.07.2002 | |
FI | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | NL | 17.07.2002 | |
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 17.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0138703 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [DA] 1,11-14,21,23,24 * claim - *; | [A]DE603732 (RUTH ALDO CO INC) [A] 1 * page 1, line 43 - line 57 * |