EP1051571 - VARIABLE CAPACITY COMPRESSOR HAVING ADJUSTABLE CRANKPIN THROW STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRISTOL COMPRESSORS INC. 15185 Industrial Park Road Bristol, VA 24204 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states BRISTOL COMPRESSORS INC. 15185 Industrial Park Road Bristol, Virginia 24202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONK, David, T. Route 1, Box 516B Lebanon, VA 24266 / US | 02 /
HILL, Joe, T. 149 Heritage Drive Bristol, VA 24201 / US | 03 /
WAGNER, Phillip, C. 102 Bramm Road Bristol, TN 37620 / US | 04 /
LOPRETE, Joseph, F. 6034 Old Jonesboro Road Bristol, TN 37620 / US | 05 /
YOUNG, Michael, R. 204 Roscommon Drive Bristol, TN 37620 / US | 06 /
SINGLETARY, Charles, A. 20257 Colony Lane Bristol, VA 24202 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99904283.1 | 26.01.1999 | [2000/46] | WO1999US01612 | Priority number, date | US19980013154 | 26.01.1998 Original published format: US 13154 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9937920 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1051571 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1051571 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/00 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
F04B49/126 (EP,US);
F04B39/00 (KR);
F04B39/0094 (EP,US);
F04B2201/0206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB [2000/46] | Title | German: | VERDICHTER MIT VERÄNDERLICHER FÖRDERMENGE UND EINSTELLBARE KURBELTRIEBANORDNUNG | [2000/46] | English: | VARIABLE CAPACITY COMPRESSOR HAVING ADJUSTABLE CRANKPIN THROW STRUCTURE | [2000/46] | French: | COMPRESSEUR A CAPACITE VARIABLE, DOTE D'UNE STRUCTURE A MANETONS | [2000/46] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2003/31: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2003/31: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2003/31: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 14.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4245966 (RIFFE DELMAR R) [AD] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 61; figures 2-4 *; | [A]DE3138812 (SCHULER GMBH L [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US4494447 (SISK FRANCIS J [US]) [DA] 1,5,6 * column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 55; figures 2-7 *; | [A]US4963075 (ALBERTSON PHILIP E [US], et al) [A] 1* column 7, line 22 - column 8, line 20; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0547351 (AIDA ENG LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract * | by applicant | US1315498 | US4236874 | US4245966 | US4248053 | US4479419 | US4494447 | US4838769 | - General Electric, Product Information Brochure GEA-115408 4/87 ISM1800 entitled "Definite Purpose Controls" |