EP1051087 - METHOD FOR ULTRA HIGH PRESSURE INACTIVATION OF MICROORGANISMS IN JUICE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2002 [2002/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLOW INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 23500 64th Avenue South Kent Washington 98032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states FLOW INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 23500 64th Avenue South Kent, Washington 98032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAGHUBEER, Errol, V. 36932 Second Avenue Southwest Federal Way, WA 98003 / US | 02 /
TING, Edmund, Y. 23642 123rd Place Southeast Kent, WA 98031 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99904474.6 | 29.01.1999 | [2000/46] | WO1999US02026 | Priority number, date | US19980016474 | 30.01.1998 Original published format: US 16474 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9938394 | Date: | 05.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1051087 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/42, A23L3/015 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
A23L2/42 (EP);
A23L3/0155 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ULTRHOCHDRUCKINAKTIVIERUNG VON MIKROORGANISMEN IN SAFTPRODUKTEN | [2000/46] | English: | METHOD FOR ULTRA HIGH PRESSURE INACTIVATION OF MICROORGANISMS IN JUICE PRODUCTS | [2000/46] | French: | PROCEDE D'INACTIVATION SOUS ULTRA HAUTE PRESSION DES MICRO-ORGANISMES DANS LES JUS | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 20.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/05] | 22.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0480422 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-31 * column 7, lines 35-55 * * claim - *; | [X]US5165325 (AKATSU MAKOTO) [X] 1-3,5,11-13,21-23,27,31,32 * column 1, lines 8-10 * * column 1, lines 32-34; figure -; claim - *; | [X]JPH0576329 ; | [A]WO9738591 (UNILEVER PLC ;UNILEVER NV (NL)) [A] 1-32 * claim - *; | [A]WO9421145 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI ;BERGMAN CARL (SE); WESTERLUND JAN (SE)) [A] 1-32 * claim - *; | [E]EP0894440 (COCA COLA CO) [E] 1-32 * column 3, lines 9-13 * * column 8, lines 56-58 * * column 3, paragraph 55 - column 4, paragraph 7; claim - * | [X] - CHEFTEL J -C, "EFFECTS OF HIGH HYDROSTATIC PRESSURE ON FOOD CONSTITUTENTS: AN OVERVIEW", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY - SUPPLEMENT, ISSN 0730-2312, pages 195 - 209, XP000600625 [X] 1-4,11-15,21-25 * page 199, paragraph 9 - page 202, paragraph 3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930723), vol. 017, no. 394, Database accession no. (C - 1088), & JP05076329 A 19930330 (SHOKUHIN SANGYO CHOKOATSU RIYOU GIJUTSU KENKYU KUMIAI) [X] 1-3,5,11-13,15 * abstract * |