EP1060553 - CURRENT-LIMITING ARRANGEMENT WITH A SUPERCONDUCTIVE TRANSFORMER ARRANGEMENT IN AN ELECTRIC CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states ABB RESEARCH LTD. 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUL, Willi Bahnhofstrasse 103A CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | 02 /
BONMANN, Dietrich Siebengebirgsring 22 D-53340 Meckenheim / DE | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2000/51] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Business Services Ltd, Intellectual Property (SLE-I), Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 99904686.5 | 03.03.1999 | [2000/51] | WO1999CH00100 | Priority number, date | DE19981009314 | 05.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19809314 | [2000/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9945622 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1060553 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060553 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/02 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
H02H9/023 (EP);
H01F2006/001 (EP);
H02H3/05 (EP);
Y02E40/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR STROMBEGRENZUNG MIT EINER SUPRALEITENDEN TRANSFORMATORANORDNUNG IN EINEM ELEKTRISCHEN SCHALTKREIS | [2000/51] | English: | CURRENT-LIMITING ARRANGEMENT WITH A SUPERCONDUCTIVE TRANSFORMER ARRANGEMENT IN AN ELECTRIC CIRCUIT | [2000/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE LIMITATION D'INTENSITE DOTE D'UN AGENCEMENT DE TRANSFORMATEUR SUPRACONDUCTEUR DANS UN CIRCUIT ELECTRIQUE | [2000/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 28.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4336561 (MURPHY JOHN H) [DA] 1 * column A *; | [A]JPS6426327 ; | [A]FR2647590 (ALSTHOM GEC [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890518), vol. 013, no. 213, Database accession no. (E - 759), & JP01026327 A 19890127 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |