EP0993407 - METHOD FOR MAKING AN AEROSOL HOUSING WITH THREADED NECK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cebal Aerosol France 105, Impasse de la Valserine 01200 Chatillon en Michaille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states CEBAL AEROSOL FRANCE 105, Impasse de la Valserine 01200 CHATILLON EN MICHAILLE / FR | ||
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states CEBAL S.A.S. 1, avenue du Général de Gaulle, ZAC des Barbanniers 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | ||
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states CEBAL S.A. 98, boulevard Victor Hugo F-92115 Clichy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLECHEUX, Franck 23, rue Molière F-01200 Bellegarde sur Valserine / FR | 02 /
GRANGER, Jacques 13, cours Tourny F-33500 Libourne / FR | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Bernard 4, rue des Six Frères F-51800 Sainte Menehould / FR | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Pigasse, Daniel, et al Alcan France SAS Propriété Industrielle 725 Rue Aristide Bergès BP25, Voreppe 38341 Moirans Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Pigasse, Daniel, et al Pechiney, Immeuble "SIS" 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99904932.3 | 23.02.1999 | [2000/16] | WO1999FR00399 | Priority number, date | FR19980002571 | 26.02.1998 Original published format: FR 9802571 | [2000/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943558 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0993407 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993407 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02, B65D41/08, B21D51/26, B65D41/02 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
B65D41/08 (EP,US);
B65D1/0246 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4987 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4994 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AEROSOL-DRUCKBEHAELTERS MIT GEWINDEHALS | [2000/16] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING AN AEROSOL HOUSING WITH THREADED NECK | [2000/16] | French: | PROCEDE POUR REALISER UN BOITIER AEROSOL A COL FILETE | [2000/16] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 29.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 31.03.2004 | NL | 31.03.2004 | ES | 12.07.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/13] | NL | 31.03.2004 | |
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | ES | 12.07.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5718352 (DIEKHOFF HANS H [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 39; figures 16,17 *; | [X]US5713235 (DIEKHOFF HANS H [US]) [X] 1-3,7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0549987 (TUBEX GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1495668 (TOURNAIRE SA) [X] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0510291 (NUSSBAUM AG E [CH]); | [DA]GB1445758 (HUTOGEPGYAR); | [DA]FR1434177 (LADOCO AG); | [A]WO9806636 (RADLEY VALLEY PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]DE29512058U (BUERKLE FELIX [DE]); | [A]DE6903478U (ALCAN ALUMINIUMWERKE GMBH FA [DE]) |