EP1058540 - ORAL PELLET WITH IMMEDIATE RELEASE COMPRISING GLYCERIDES SUBJECTED TO POLYGLYCOLYSIS, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GATTEFOSSE HOLDING 36 Chemin de Genas 69800 St Priest / FR | [2002/18] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states GATTEFOSSE S.A. 36 chemin de Genas 69800 Saint Priest / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTHELEMY, Philippe 12, allée des Feuillantines F-69780 Myons / FR | 02 /
FARAH, Nabil 128, avenue Berthelot F-69007 Lyon / FR | 03 /
ROUSSIN, Pascale 14, rue Grenette F-69002 Lyon / FR | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Vuillermoz, Bruno Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99904939.8 | 24.02.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999FR00406 | Priority number, date | FR19980002855 | 04.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9802855 | [2000/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944589 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058540 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058540 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
A61K9/1617 (EP);
A61K9/1623 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI [2000/50] | Title | German: | POLYGLYKOLISIERTE GLYCERIDE ENTHALTENDE RASCH-FREISETZENDE PELLETFORMULIERUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2000/50] | English: | ORAL PELLET WITH IMMEDIATE RELEASE COMPRISING GLYCERIDES SUBJECTED TO POLYGLYCOLYSIS, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | [2000/50] | French: | PELLET ORAL A LIBERATION IMMEDIATE COMPRENANT DES GLYCERIDES POLYGLYCOLYSES, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 19.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDA]US4869900 (POZZI FRANCO ET AL) [XD] 1-4 * column 1, lines 5-9 * * column 2, lines 33-38 * * column 3, lines 1-20 * * examples 1-7 * * claims 1,3,5,8 * [A] 9; | [XDA]WO9423700 (UNIV GENT ;REMON JEAN PAUL (BE)) [XD] 1 * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 23 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, lines 14-25 * * page 7, lines 7-15 * * examples 1,2,6 * * claims 1-5,7 * [A] 9; | [A]US4786495 (BIRD GRAHAM ET AL) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 10 * * column 2, lines 22-29 * * column 2, lines 55-67 * * column 3, lines 25-53 * * column 4, lines 14-20 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, lines 26-35 * * examples 1-12 * * claim - *; | [E]WO9921534 (MERCK PATENT GMBH) [E] 1,4-6,8 * page 1, line 9 - page 3, line 5 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 4 * * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 18 * * examples 2,4 * * claims 1,2,4,13,17,19 *; | [PA]WO9810762 (NAPPER JAMES ALBERT ;ROUSSEAU LAURENCE (GB); SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PL) [PA] 1,9 * examples 6,8 * | [A] - A.ESQUISABEL, A. SAN VINCENTE, M. IGARTUA, R.M.HERNÀNDEZ, A.R. GASCON, M.B. CALVO AND J.L. PEDRAZ, "Influence of melting point and hydrophilic/lipophilic balance on the release of salbutamol sulfate from lipid matrices", STP PHARMA SCIENCES, (1996), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 365 - 69, XP002087329 [A] 1 * abstract * *page 366, "Formulations"* *page 367, "Release kinetics"* |