Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1056753
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
21.09.2001 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] |
08.06.2001 |
First examination report |
|
07.06.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.10.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] |
21.10.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] |
21.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|