EP1056808 - MONOAZO DYESTUFFS, A COMPOSITION AND AN INK FOR INK JET PRINTING COMPRISING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avecia Limited Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [2000/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kenworthy, Mark Hexagon House, P.O. Box 42 Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | 02 /
Kenyon, Ronald Wynford The Haven, 1 Greenhayes, Shipton Gorge Bridport, Dorset DT6 4LU / GB | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Mayall, John Avecia Limited Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House, Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Mayall, John Avecia Limited Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | ||
Former [2000/49] | Mayall, John Intellectual Property Group, Avecia Limited, PO Box 42, Hexagon House, Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99905064.4 | 16.02.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999GB00479 | Priority number, date | GB19980004175 | 28.02.1998 Original published format: GB 9804175 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943754 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1056808 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1056808 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09B29/00, C09B29/36, C09D11/00 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
C09D11/328 (EP,US);
C09B44/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/49] | Title | German: | MONOAZOFARBSTOFFE, DIESE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND TINTE FÜR DAS TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKVERFAHREN | [2000/49] | English: | MONOAZO DYESTUFFS, A COMPOSITION AND AN INK FOR INK JET PRINTING COMPRISING THEM | [2000/49] | French: | COLORANTS MONOAZO, COMPOSITION ET ENCRE D'IMPRESSION A JET D'ENCRE CONTENANT LESDITS COLORANTS | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 19.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8601815 (SANDOZ AG [CH]); | [A]EP0325973 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]US5413630 (SCHWARZ WILLIAM M [US], et al); | [A]US5543259 (SCHWARZ WILLIAM M [US], et al) |