EP1057043 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO RADAR SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS (Defence Systems) Limited Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire, GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states BAE Systems (Defence Systems) Limited Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire, GU14 6YU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLS, Robert William 7 School Lane, Carisbrooke, Newport Isle of Wight PO30 5JX / GB | 02 /
BAKER, Jonathan Howard Cliff Cottage, 1 Shore Road Gurnard, Isle of Wight PO31 8LB / GB | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Rooney, Paul Blaise BAE Systems plc Group Intellectual Property Dept. Lancaster House - P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Rooney, Paul Blaise BAE Systems, Group IP Department, Lancaster House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99905065.1 | 15.02.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999GB00480 | Priority number, date | GB19980003906 | 26.02.1998 Original published format: GB 9803906 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944076 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1057043 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1057043 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/52, G01S13/538 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
G01S13/5242 (EP,US);
G01S13/5244 (EP,US);
G01S13/5248 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [2000/49] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN ODER BEZÜGLICH RADARSYSTEMEN | [2000/49] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO RADAR SYSTEMS | [2000/49] | French: | AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES SYSTEMES RADAR | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 17.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 30.06.2005 | GR | 30.06.2005 | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/13] | DK | 30.06.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0069415 (HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN BV [NL]) [A] 1,2,5 * page 15, line 26 - page 19, line 9 *; | [A]GB1285508 (NORTH AMERICAN ROCKWELL [US]) [A] 1,3 * page 4, line 87 - page 5, line 80 *; | [A]US4068231 (WILMOT RICHARD D) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 36 * * figure 2 *; | [A]GB2055524 (SECR DEFENCE) [A] 1 * page 1, line 84 - line 114 * | [A] - MYERS H ET AL, "PROCESSING TECHNIQUES FOR SURFACE SURVEILLANCE RADARS IN LITTORAL ENVIRONMENTS", INTERNATIONAL RADAR CONFERENCE, ALEXANDRIA, MAY 8 - 11, 1995, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19950508), pages 33 - 38, XP000529109 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RADAR.1995.522515 |