blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0978829

EP0978829 - NEAR FIELD OPTICAL MEMORY HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.05.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.06.2008  [2008/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Instruments Inc.
8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/28]For all designated states
SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC.
8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Seiko Instruments Inc.
8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KASAMA, Nobuyuki, Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
02 / MITSUOKA, Yasuyuki, Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
03 / CHIBA, Norio, Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
04 / NIWA, Takashi, Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
05 / NAKAJIMA, Kunio, Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
06 / OUMI, Manabu, Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
07 / KATO, Kenji, Seiko Instruments Inc.
8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
08 / SHINOGI, Masataka, Seiko Instruments R & D Center
Inc., 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane
London, EC2V 8AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey, et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London, WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99905268.122.02.1999
[2000/06]
WO1999JP00781
Priority number, dateJP1998004371525.02.1998         Original published format: JP 4371598
JP1998004371825.02.1998         Original published format: JP 4371898
JP1999000454811.01.1999         Original published format: JP 454899
JP1999000680213.01.1999         Original published format: JP 680299
[2000/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9944198
Date:02.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978829
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978829
Date:11.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.09.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.2000
ClassificationIPC:G11B7/135
[2000/06]
CPC:
G11B7/122 (EP,US); G11B7/12 (EP,US); G11B7/124 (EP,US);
G11B7/1387 (EP,US); G11B7/22 (EP,US); B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
Y10S977/862 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/06]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHER NAHFELDKOPF FÜR SPEICHER[2000/06]
English:NEAR FIELD OPTICAL MEMORY HEAD[2000/06]
French:TETE DE MEMOIRE OPTIQUE DANS LE CHAMP PROCHE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase14.10.1999Translation filed 
28.10.1999National basic fee paid 
28.10.1999Search fee paid 
28.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
25.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2006Fee for grant paid
09.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
30.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)EP06006226.2  / EP1684275
Opposition(s)14.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9503561  (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 35 * * page 10, line 11 - page 11, line 3 * * page 21, line 20 - page 23, line 22 * * figures 14-17 *;
 [A]EP0797117  (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 5 - line 14 * * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 32 * * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 22 * * figures 1,2,6,7 *;
 [A]US4725727  (HARDER CHRISTOPH S [CH], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 61 *;
 [A]EP0535611  (FUJIHIRA MASAMICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 6, line 18 - line 54 * * figure 5 *;
 [A]US5354985  (QUATE CALVIN F [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 66 - column 5, line 34 *;
 [A]JPH09269329  ;
 [E]US6046972  (KURODA RYO [JP], et al) [E] 1-17;
 [DA]US5294790  (OHTA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-17 * column 7, line 7 - line 54; figure 9 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09269329 A 19971014 (CANON INC) [A] 1-17 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH09231608  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]JPH08106646  (SEIKO INSTR INC)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.