EP1058987 - DYNAMIC FRAME SIZE SETTING FOR MULTICHANNEL TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tantivy Communications Suite 300, 2200 Front Street Melbourne, FL 32901 / US | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMALFITANO, Carlo 705 Riverside Drive Melbourne Beach, FL 32951 / US | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99905640.1 | 02.02.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999US02223 | Priority number, date | US19980030049 | 24.02.1998 Original published format: US 30049 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944341 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058987 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/14, H04L1/18, H04L1/12, H04J13/00 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
H04L25/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0007 (EP,US);
H04L1/165 (EP,US);
H04L1/1809 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHES FESTLEGEN VON RAHMENGRÖSSE FÜR MEHRKANALÜBERTRAGUNG | [2000/50] | English: | DYNAMIC FRAME SIZE SETTING FOR MULTICHANNEL TRANSMISSION | [2000/50] | French: | REGLAGE DYNAMIQUE DE LA TAILLE DES TRAMES POUR LA TRANSMISSION MULTIVOIE | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 03.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0443061 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 1 - line 5 * * page 2, line 25 - line 42 * * see equations 3 and 11 *; | [A]EP0635949 (ALCATEL MOBILE COMM FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 1 - line 2 * * page 2, line 58 - page 3, line 10 *; | [XP]FR2761557 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [XP] 1-3,7,12 * page 3, line 9 - line 27 *; | [AP]US5781542 (TANAKA HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [AP] 12 * column 1, line 46 - line 52 * * column 2, line 41 - line 55 * | [A] - SHACHAM; BYUNG CHEOL SHIN, "A selective-repeat-ARQ protocol for prallel channels and its resequencing analysis", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, US, (199204), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 773 - 782, XP000297814 [A] 1-14 * page 773, column R, paragraph 3 - page 774, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 774, column R, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.141433 |