EP1071587 - DEVICE TO DETECT SEAT BELT BUCKLE STATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECHNOLOGY, INC. P.O. Box 33050 Lakeland, FL 33807-3050 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Breed Automotive Technology, Inc. P.O. Box 33050 Lakeland, FL 33807-3050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUSBY, Harald, S. 5625 Emerald Ridge Boulevard Lakeland, FL 33813 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Vihang, C. 2339 Miles Court Lakeland, FL 33813 / US | 03 /
PATEL, Ashok, F. 1334 Crimson Clover Lane Wesley Chapel, FL 33543 / US | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99905642.7 | 02.02.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999US02230 | Priority number, date | US19980065684 | 24.04.1998 Original published format: US 65684 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9955561 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071587 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1071587 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/48, A44B11/26, G01D5/16 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
G01D5/147 (EP,US);
B60R22/48 (EP,KR,US);
B60R2022/4816 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45623 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERKENNEN EINES GURTSCHLOSSZUSTANDS | [2001/05] | English: | DEVICE TO DETECT SEAT BELT BUCKLE STATUS | [2001/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DETECTER LA POSITION DE LA BOUCLE D'UNE CEINTURE DE SECURITE | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.06.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 07.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 29.01.2004 | ES | 09.02.2004 | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/24] | SE | 29.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3766612 (HATTORI H) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]EP0234458 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19647320 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 56 - line 64 * * column 19, line 7 - column 20, line 10; figures 18,19 *; | [A]DE19630108 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [PA]US5742986 (CORRION STEVEN G [US], et al) [PA] 1,6 * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 25; figures 1-4 *; | [PXY]US5752299 (VIVACQUA RAYMOND [US], et al) [PX] 1,4 * column W * [Y] 6; | [PAY]US5839174 (CHAMINGS TONY [US], et al) [PA] 1 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 5; figures 1-4 * [Y] 6; | [PA]EP0893314 (TRW INC [US]) [PA] 1* column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 19; figures 1-6 * |