Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2586599 | Global Dossier | 23.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9902516 | 05.02.1999 | US1982398 | 06.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1054724 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2004 | B1 | EP1054724 | 29.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9902516 | 05.02.1999 | US1982398 | 06.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2320450 | 09.01.2007 | C | CA2320450 | 12.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9902516 | 05.02.1999 | US1982398 | 06.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69917433T | 20.01.2005 | T2 | DE69917433D1 | 24.06.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9902516 | 05.02.1999 | US1982398 | 06.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9939813 | Global Dossier | 12.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1982398 | 06.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5971601 | 26.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US1982398 | 06.02.1998 |