EP1080303 - FUEL INJECTOR HAVING DIFFERENTIAL PISTON FOR PRESSURIZING FUEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2980 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2980 / US | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Siemens Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2980 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORRAINE, Jack, R. 11712 Jefferson Avenue, Suite C-222 Newport News, VA 23606 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Allen, Derek Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Siemens House Oldbury, Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Allen, Derek Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Siemens House Oldbury Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | ||
Former [2001/10] | Allen, Derek Siemens Shared Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99905889.4 | 09.02.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999US02746 | Priority number, date | US19980055927 | 06.04.1998 Original published format: US 55927 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9951871 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1080303 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1080303 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02M49/02, F02M51/06, F02M57/02 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
F02M49/02 (EP,KR,US);
F02M51/0671 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/10] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL MIT DIFFERENTIALKOLBEN ZUR KRAFTSTOFFDRUCKERZEUGUNG | [2001/10] | English: | FUEL INJECTOR HAVING DIFFERENTIAL PISTON FOR PRESSURIZING FUEL | [2001/10] | French: | INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT DOTE D'UN PISTON DIFFERENTIEL POUR LA PRESSURISATION DU CARBURANT | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 19.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.04.2004 | [2008/17] | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1141566 (BESSIÈRE) [A] 1,2,5,6,9 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 3; figure . *; | [A]US2332909 (OTTAVIO FUSCALDO) [A] 1,2,5,6 * page 3, column L, line 51 - column R, line 39; figure 3 *; | [DA]US4197996 (GIARDINI DANTE S [US]) [DA] 1,5 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 30; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US4197996 |